Trespass

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0028Primary and Secondary Education - Security - School Resource OfficersDelegate ClusterIn the House - Hearing 1/28 at 3:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/28/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0128Criminal Law - Crimes Against Property - Trespass to a VehicleDelegate AfzaliIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0227Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of AbuseDelegate AngelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0287 / CH0235
    (SB0808)
Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Liability for TrespassDelegate O'DonnellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 235Environment and Transportation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0373Real Property - Candidates and Campaign Volunteers - Access to Private Residential AreasDelegate TarlauIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0808
    (HB0287 / CH0235)
Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Liability for TrespassSenator KlausmeierVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.