Truancy

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0055 / CH0249Baltimore County - Education - WhyTry ProgramDelegate ClusterApproved by the Governor - Chapter 249Ways and Means
1/28/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0429 / CH0266Task Force to Combat Habitual Student TruancyDelegate PattersonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 266Ways and Means
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/9/2016 - 12:30 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0709 / CH0672
    (SB0422 / CH0671)
Education - Maryland School for the Blind - FundingDelegate JonesEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 672Ways and Means
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1139 / CH0300Education - Community School Strategy - Required Notice and SupportDelegate Washington, M.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 300Ways and Means
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0422 / CH0671
    (HB0709 / CH0672)
Education - Maryland School for the Blind - FundingSenator KasemeyerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 671Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.