Trucks

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 15

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0058 / CH0608Vehicle Laws - Historic Motor Vehicles - Authorized Uses and InspectionsDelegate O'DonnellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 608Environment and Transportation
1/28/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0162Comptroller - Taxpayer Protection ActChair, Judiciary CommitteeIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)Judiciary
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0179Vehicle Laws - Chesapeake Bay Commemorative Registration Plates - Truck EligibilityDelegate Robinson, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0392
    (SB0274)
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Retired Law Enforcement OfficersDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0486Motor Vehicles - Gross Vehicle Weight - Agricultural ProductsDelegate ReillyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0540Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Trade-Ins and Core ChargesDelegate LamIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0698
    (SB0573)
Motor Vehicles - Gross Weight and Axle Load - PoultryDelegate OttoIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0805
    (SB0774 / CH0231)
Motor Vehicles - Autocycles - Standards and RequirementsDelegate BeidleVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1102Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Celebrating Maryland Native Plants and PollinatorsDelegate AfzaliIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1473Public Schools - School Vehicles - Three-Point Seat BeltsDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0183School Vehicles - Seat Belts - RequirementsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0274
    (HB0392)
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Retired Law Enforcement OfficersSenator KingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0292Tax Assessments - Appeals Procedures - Application for Revision or Claim for RefundSenator BatesIn the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0573
    (HB0698)
Task Force to Study the Impact of Hauling Grain, Poultry, and Dairy on State HighwaysSenator MathiasIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
SB0774 / CH0231
    (HB0805)
Motor Vehicles - Autocycles - Standards and RequirementsSenator NormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 231Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.