Tuition

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 28

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0057
    (SB0237)
University System of Maryland - Pay It Forward Pilot Program and Tuition Freeze - StudiesDelegate ReznikIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0152
    (SB0535)
Community Colleges - Tuition Waiver for Disabled Individuals - RequirementsDelegate ReznikIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0211Task Force to Study Pay It ForwardDelegate HillIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0297
    (SB0225 / CH0333)
Higher Education - Unaccompanied Homeless Youth Tuition Exemption - ModificationDelegate Washington, M.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB0344
    (SB0390)
Education - Due Process Hearings for Children With Disabilities - Burden of ProofDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0487Maryland Education CreditSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0578
    (SB0514)
Higher Education - Net Price Calculator Improvement Act - EstablishmentDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0643
    (SB0567 / CH0366)
Department of Human Resources - State Child Welfare System - ReportDelegate ZuckerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsChildren (O4)
HB0648Community Colleges - Tuition Waiver for Full-Time Students - Partial State ReimbursementDelegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0673Community Colleges - Tuition Waiver for Full-Time Students - Full State ReimbursementDelegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0692College Savings Plans of Maryland - Maryland College Savings Account Plan - AuthorizationDelegate FrickIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0696Maryland Education Opportunity Act of 2015Delegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0784Harford Community College - Requirements to Propose Tuition IncreaseDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Hearing cancelledWays and MeansCommunity Colleges - Local Bills (F4)
HB0799 / CH0279Higher Education - Veterans and Dependents Nonresident Tuition - Compliance With Federal LawDelegate Young, P.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 279Ways and Means
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB0847 / CH0341
    (SB0335 / CH0340)
Community Colleges - Victims of Human Trafficking - Exemption From Out-of-County and Out-of-Region FeesDelegate SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 341Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB1105
    (SB0761 / CH0382)
Disabled Individuals - Task Force on the Maryland ABLE ProgramDelegate ZuckerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationDisabled (O3)
HB1136Higher Education - Military Dependents - In-State TuitionDelegate ShoemakerIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0131Baltimore City Community College - Tuition Waivers - Graduates of Baltimore City Public High SchoolsSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Higher Education (F2)
SB0225 / CH0333
    (HB0297)
Higher Education - Unaccompanied Homeless Youth Tuition Exemption - ModificationSenator ReillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 333Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0237
    (HB0057)
University System of Maryland - Pay It Forward Pilot Program and Tuition Freeze - StudiesSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Higher Education (F2)
SB0335 / CH0340
    (HB0847 / CH0341)
Community Colleges - Victims of Human Trafficking - Exemption From Out-of-County and Out-of-Region FeesSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 340Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0390
    (HB0344)
Education - Due Process Hearings for Children With Disabilities - Burden of ProofSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0405Maryland Education CreditSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0514
    (HB0578)
Higher Education - Net Price Calculator Improvement Act - EstablishmentSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0535
    (HB0152)
Community Colleges - Tuition Waiver for Disabled Individuals - RequirementsSenator MadalenoIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0567 / CH0366
    (HB0643)
Department of Human Resources - State Child Welfare System - ReportSenator GladdenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 366Judicial Proceedings
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/8/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Children (O4)
SB0761 / CH0382
    (HB1105)
Disabled Individuals - Task Force on the Maryland ABLE ProgramSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 382Budget and Taxation
3/18/2015 - 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
4/8/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Disabled (O3)
SB0843University System of Maryland - Members of the Armed Forces - Financial AidSenator WaughIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsHigher Education (F2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.