Unemployment

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 15

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0281Determination of Unemployment Insurance Benefits - Voluntarily Leaving Work - Valid CircumstancesDelegate HoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Unemployment Insurance (K2)
HB0283Unemployment Insurance - Appeal of Benefit Determination - Discovery of Financial CrimeDelegate HoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Unemployment Insurance (K2)
HB0348 / CH0098Unemployment Insurance - Employer Contributions - Application for Refund or AdjustmentChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 98Economic Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Unemployment Insurance (K2)
HB0354 / CH0103Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits - Monetary Penalty for FraudChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 103Economic Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Unemployment Insurance (K2)
HB0583 / CH0121Unemployment Insurance - Relief from Charges for Overpayment of Benefits - RestrictionsChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 121Economic Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Unemployment Insurance (K2)
HB0689Income Tax Credit - Unemployed Veterans - Start-Up BusinessDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0884
    (SB0686 / CH0526)
Family Investment Program - Earned Income Disregard Pilot ProgramDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB0955 / CH0394
    (SB0888)
Task Force to Study Temporary Disability Insurance Programs and the Process for Assisting Individuals with Disabilities at Local Departments of Social ServicesDelegate JamesonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 394Economic Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB1019 / CH0293
    (SB0586 / CH0292)
Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Hub and Spoke Program in the Southern Maryland RegionDelegate JamesonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 293Environmental Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAgriculture (M4)
HB1513 / CH0420
    (SB1037)
Public Safety - Response to a State Disaster or Emergency - Licensing and TaxesDelegate HixsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 420Ways and Means
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0051Employment Contracts - Noncompetition Covenant - Conditions Affecting EnforcementSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
1/24/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0586 / CH0292
    (HB1019 / CH0293)
Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Hub and Spoke Program in the Southern Maryland RegionSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 292Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0686 / CH0526
    (HB0884)
Family Investment Program - Earned Income Disregard Pilot ProgramSenator GaragiolaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 526Finance
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB0888
    (HB0955 / CH0394)
Task Force to Study Temporary Disability Insurance Programs and the Process for Assisting Individuals with Disabilities at Local Departments of Social ServicesSenator GaragiolaVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersInsurance - Health (C3)
SB1037
    (HB1513 / CH0420)
Public Safety - Response to a State Disaster or Emergency - Licensing and TaxesSenator KingIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.