Unions

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0318Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to WorkDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0475Public School Labor Relations - Renegotiation Procedures and Board AdministrationChair, Ways and Means CommitteeIn the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB0667 / CH0262
    (SB0422 / CH0261)
Public School Employees - Collective Bargaining - Representation FeesDelegate HixsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 262Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0863
    (SB0841 / CH0428)
Higher Education Fair Share ActSpeakerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0895 / CH0648Education - Howard County Library System - Collective Bargaining Ho. Co. 3-13Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 648Ways and Means
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB1071Prince George's County - City of College Park - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses for Supermarkets PG 310-13Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1249Baltimore City - School Construction - Block GrantsDelegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0422 / CH0261
    (HB0667 / CH0262)
Public School Employees - Collective Bargaining - Representation FeesSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 261Finance
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/8/2013 - 11:30 a.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0666Procurement - Required Clauses - Project Labor Agreement ProhibitionSenator KittlemanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0668Labor and Employment - Right to WorkSenator KittlemanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0841 / CH0428
    (HB0863)
Higher Education Fair Share ActPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 428Finance
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.