Urban Renewal

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0108 / CH0082Housing and Community Development - Neighborhood and Community Assistance Program - Project ProposalsDelegate LaffertyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 82Environmental Matters
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0203Economic Development - Arts, Business, and Cultural District - Pennsylvania Avenue Corridor in Baltimore CityDelegate StukesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0864Real Property - Eminent Domain - Limitations on Condemnation AuthorityDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersReal Property (N1)
HB1020 / CH0143Baltimore City - Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact GrantsDelegate RosenbergApproved by the Governor - Chapter 143Ways and Means
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB1143Gaming - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Pimlico Historic Preservation CommissionDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansGaming (C7)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.