Urban Renewal

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0394
    (SB0317 / CH0149)
More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017SpeakerIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationWays and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0659 / CH0615
    (SB0823 / CH0616)
Task Force to Study Tax Sales in MarylandDelegate AngelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 615Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1078
    (SB0838)
Creation of a State Debt - Washington County - Hagerstown Urban Improvement ProjectDelegate Wilson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/13/2017 - 11:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1323 / CH0241Property Tax - Credit for Revitalization DistrictsDelegate LongApproved by the Governor - Chapter 241Ways and Means
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1345 / CH0523National Capital Strategic Economic Development FundDelegate Washington, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 523Environment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0317 / CH0149
    (HB0394)
More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 149Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0823 / CH0616
    (HB0659 / CH0615)
Task Force to Study Tax Sales in MarylandSenator EckardtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 616Budget and Taxation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0838
    (HB1078)
Creation of a State Debt - Washington County - Hagerstown Urban Improvement ProjectSenator SerafiniIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/13/2017 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:28 A.M.