Vandalism

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0028Primary and Secondary Education - Security - School Resource OfficersDelegate ClusterIn the House - Hearing 1/28 at 3:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/28/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0227Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of AbuseDelegate AngelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0270
    (SB0404)
Criminal Law - Arson, Burning, Malicious Destruction, and Theft - Property of Another - DefinitionDelegate Wilson, B.In the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0494Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by SummonsDelegate AndersonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0129Criminal Law - Desecration of Human Remains - PenaltySenator GladdenIn the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0404
    (HB0270)
Criminal Law - Arson, Burning, Malicious Destruction, and Theft - Property of Another - DefinitionSenator CassillyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.