Veterans Affairs, Department of

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0242 / CH0153
    (SB0053 / CH0152)
Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program Fund - Alteration of ProgramDelegate SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 153Health and Government Operations
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0317
    (SB0260)
State Lottery – Instant Ticket Lottery Machines – Fraternal Organizations ("Slots" for Homeless Veterans Act)Delegate ClarkIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB1096 / CH0786State Government - Veteran Employment and Transition Success ProgramDelegate WaldstreicherApproved by the Governor - Chapter 786Health and Government Operations
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1214Public Safety - Trauma-Affected Veterans Training Program - EstablishmentDelegate FoldenIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1542 / CH0795Department of Commerce – Employment in the State’s Defense Industry – StudyDelegate LisantiApproved by the Governor - Chapter 795Economic Matters
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1760
    (SB1165 / CH0740)
Procurement - Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprise ParticipationDelegate CarozzaIn the House - Third Reading Passed (140-0)Health and Government Operations
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0053 / CH0152
    (HB0242 / CH0153)
Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program Fund - Alteration of ProgramSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 152Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/11/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0260
    (HB0317)
State Lottery – Instant Ticket Lottery Machines – Fraternal Organizations (“Slots” for Homeless Veterans Act)Senator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0911Veteran Suicide Prevention - Comprehensive Action PlanSenator WaughIn the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB1118Public Safety - Trauma-Affected Veterans Training Program - EstablishmentSenator HoughIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesPublic Safety (E4)
SB1165 / CH0740
    (HB1760)
Procurement – Veteran–Owned Small Business Enterprise ParticipationSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 740Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:44 A.M.