Video

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 33

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0043 / CH0583Criminal Law - Harassment - Revenge PornDelegate SimmonsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 583Judiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0057Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems and Work Zone Speed Control SystemsDelegate CardinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0064Criminal Law - Intentional Disclosure of Sexually Explicit Image of Another Person Without ConsentDelegate CardinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0071Speed Monitoring Systems - Penalty for Erroneous CitationsDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0082Baltimore City - Speed Monitoring Systems - Penalty for Erroneous CitationsDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0116Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers - Video CamerasDelegate ConawayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0177General Assembly - Live and Archived Video Streaming of MeetingsDelegate HoughIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0204Crimes - Extortion of Sexually Explicit ImagesDelegate McDermottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0235Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and Correctional OfficersDelegate Kelly, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0316State Board of Education - Training Video on Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation and Automated External DefibrillatorsDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsWays and Means
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0336Criminal Law - Coercion to Provide Sexually Explicit Images - PenaltiesCharles County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0469Speed Monitoring Systems - School Zones - Days of OperationDelegate DavisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0491Criminal Law - Intentionally Causing Emotional Distress - Distribution of Images or VideoDelegate FrickIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0526Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Daily Calibration and Video RecordingsDelegate SmigielIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0537Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Confinement and Release of Criminal Defendants - Initial Appearance and Representation by the Office of the Public DefenderChair, Judiciary CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0539
    (SB0539)
Task Force to Study the Implementation and Use of Body Cameras by Law Enforcement OfficersDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0551Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - RepealDelegate SmigielIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0565Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - RestitutionDelegate HowardIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0633Baltimore City - Law Enforcement Officers - Video CamerasDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0650Baltimore County - Use of Speed Monitoring SystemsDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0802 / CH0426
    (SB0198 / CH0141)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - TelemedicineDelegate LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 426Health and Government Operations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0929 / CH0491
    (SB0652)
Speed Monitoring Systems Reform Act of 2014Delegate MaloneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 491Environmental Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1109 / CH0107Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - ProceduresDelegate SwainApproved by the Governor - Chapter 107Judiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1196
    (SB0065)
Business Regulation - Retail Service Stations - Video Cameras RequiredDelegate SwainIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1200 / CH0202
    (SB0752)
Public Safety - Eyewitness Identification - ProceduresDelegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 202Judiciary
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Public Safety (E4)
HB1360Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems - WarningDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0065
    (HB1196)
Business Regulation - Retail Service Stations - Video Cameras RequiredSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
1/23/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0117Juvenile Law - Commitment - Placement VisitsChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/9/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0198 / CH0141
    (HB0802 / CH0426)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - TelemedicineSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 141Finance
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0350 / CH0490Speed Monitoring Systems Reform Act of 2014Senator BrochinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 490Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0539
    (HB0539)
Task Force to Study the Implementation and Use of Body Cameras by Law Enforcement OfficersSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0697Maryland Transportation Authority - Electronic Toll Collection - ProceduresSenator StoneIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB0860 / CH0201Public Safety - Eyewitness Identification - ProceduresSenator GladdenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 201Judicial Proceedings
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:36 P.M.