Vital Records

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0454
    (SB0490 / CH0497)
Child Abuse and Neglect – Disclosure of Identifying InformationDelegate MoonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsSocial Services - Generally (O1)
HB0569Vital Statistics and Records – Definition of Licensed Health Care Practitioner – Certified Nurse Midwife, Licensed Clinical Professional Counselor, and Physician AssistantDelegate MoralesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1159 / CH0154
    (SB0066 / CH0155)
Health – Vital Statistics – Veteran and Armed Services Member Suicide ReportingDelegate Young, P.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154Health and Government Operations
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1326Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of CitizenshipDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0038 / CH0526Motor Vehicle Administration – Birth Certificates – Issuance of CopiesChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 526Finance
1/17/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0060Family Law - Same-Sex Couples - Marital Presumption and Expedited Second Parent AdoptionSenator SmithIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
SB0066 / CH0155
    (HB1159 / CH0154)
Health – Vital Statistics – Veteran and Armed Services Member Suicide ReportingSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 155Finance
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0266 / CH0083
    (HB0716 / CH0082)
Maryland Health Care Commission – Mortality Rates of African American Infants and Infants in Rural Areas – StudySenator Nathan-PulliamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 83Finance
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0292 / CH0551Estates - Administration Exemption - Transfer of Motor Vehicle and Boat TitlesSenator NormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 551Judicial Proceedings
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0490 / CH0497
    (HB0454)
Child Abuse and Neglect – Disclosure of Identifying InformationSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 497Judicial Proceedings
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 29, 2018 3:56 P.M.