Vocational Rehabilitation

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0349 / CH0415
    (SB0894)
Procurement Preferences - Pricing and Selection CommitteesDelegate Robinson, B.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415Health and Government Operations
3/16/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1105
    (SB0761 / CH0382)
Disabled Individuals - Task Force on the Maryland ABLE ProgramDelegate ZuckerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationDisabled (O3)
HB1172 / CH0470Individuals With Developmental Disabilities - Providers - LicensesChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 470Health and Government Operations
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/13/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0761 / CH0382
    (HB1105)
Disabled Individuals - Task Force on the Maryland ABLE ProgramSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 382Budget and Taxation
3/18/2015 - 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
4/8/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Disabled (O3)
SB0894
    (HB0349 / CH0415)
Procurement Preferences - Pricing and Selection CommitteesSenator PughIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsState Government - Procurement (P2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.