Volunteers

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 37

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0085
    (SB0050)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Segal AmeriCorps Education AwardDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Hearing 1/23 at 11:00 a.m.Ways and Means
1/23/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0189Courts - Peace Orders - Acts Committed Against EmployeesSenator FeldmanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0326
    (SB0333)
Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse RegistryDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0428 / CH0114Child Abuse and Neglect - Reports and Records - Disclosure to Public Institutions of Higher EducationDelegate Kelly, K.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0558Maryland Liberty Preservation Act of 2013Delegate DwyerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0610
    (SB0596)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Laytonsville District Volunteer Fire StationDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0615
    (SB0612)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Kingsville Volunteer Fire CompanyDelegate BromwellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0684Tobacco-Free Schools ActDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0778 / CH0332
    (SB0899 / CH0331)
Local Government - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - DistributionDelegate ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 332Health and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0876Child Abuse - Failure to Report - Civil Penalty, Fund, and Task ForceDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0889
    (SB0621 / CH0066)
Vehicles Laws - Emergency Vehicles - Motorcades and EscortsDelegate MaloneVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0890
    (SB0610 / CH0299)
Health - Overdose Response Program - EstablishmentDelegate BromwellVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Public Health (J1)
HB0899
    (SB0550)
State Board of Physicians - Disciplinary and Licensure Procedures - RevisionDelegate KachIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1004
    (SB0774 / CH0546)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Maryland Civil Air PatrolDelegate CardinIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationWays and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1007
    (SB0744)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Bohrer Park Miniature Golf CourseDelegate BarveIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1075
    (SB0657)
Criminal Law - Third Degree Sexual Offense - Person in Position of AuthorityDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1083Prince George's County - Gaming - Charity Chips PG 312-13Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB1248Workers' Compensation - Average Weekly Wage - Volunteer Company MemberDelegate JamesonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB1256Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease - Post-Traumatic Stress DisorderDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersWorkers' Compensation (K1)
HB1310
    (SB0834)
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"Delegate DumaisIn the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1372 / CH0430
    (SB0934)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 430Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrior Authorizations (B4)
HB1478Baltimore County - Division of Animal Control - Treatment of Unclaimed Dogs or CatsDelegate CardinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0050
    (HB0085)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Segal AmeriCorps Education AwardSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0094Child Abuse and Neglect - Notice and Reporting Requirements, Disclosure, and Task ForceSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0169Criminal Procedure - Reports to Crimesolvers/Crimestoppers Organization - Inadmissibility and ConfidentialitySenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/30/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0333
    (HB0326)
Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse RegistrySenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0550
    (HB0899)
State Board of Physicians - Disciplinary and Licensure Procedures - RevisionSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0587 / CH0503Higher Education - Charles W. Riley Firefighter and Ambulance and Rescue Squad Member ScholarshipSenator GaragiolaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 503Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0596
    (HB0610)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Laytonsville District Volunteer Fire StationSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0610 / CH0299
    (HB0890)
Health - Overdose Response Program - EstablishmentSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 299Finance
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0612
    (HB0615)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Kingsville Volunteer Fire CompanySenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0621 / CH0066
    (HB0889)
Vehicles Laws - Emergency Vehicles - Motorcades and EscortsSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 66Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0657
    (HB1075)
Criminal Law - Third Degree Sexual Offense - Person in Position of AuthoritySenator KingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0774 / CH0546
    (HB1004)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Maryland Civil Air PatrolSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 546Budget and Taxation
3/13/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0834
    (HB1310)
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider" Senator GladdenIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0899 / CH0331
    (HB0778 / CH0332)
Local Government - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - DistributionSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 331Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0934
    (HB1372 / CH0430)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.