Volunteers

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 30

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0023Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse RegistryDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
1/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0041Immunities - Associations, Organizations, and Charities - Liability of Agents and VolunteersDelegate RosenbergIn the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0167
    (SB0230 / CH0154)
Calvert County - Length of Service Award Program - Recipient BenefitsCalvert County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0274 / CH0234
    (SB0510)
Frederick County - Gaming EventsFrederick County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 234Ways and Means
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0280Carroll County - Gaming EventsCarroll County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0368 / CH0360
    (SB0214)
Civil Actions - Immunity From Liability - Emergency Medical Care for Drug OverdoseDelegate BeidleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 360Judiciary
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0373Real Property - Candidates and Campaign Volunteers - Access to Private Residential AreasDelegate TarlauIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0425 / CH0246Howard County - Casino Events - Authorized Ho. Co. 7-15Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 246Ways and Means
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0669Task Force to Study the Establishment of a Senior Volunteer CorpsDelegate TarlauIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Elderly (O2)
HB0706Prince George's County - Alternatives to Suspension Pilot Program - Establishment PG 412-15Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0745
    (SB0516 / CH0356)
Public Health - Overdose Response ProgramDelegate BromwellVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0898Civil Actions - Immunity From Liability - Emergency Medical Care for Drug OverdoseDelegate BromwellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0948
    (SB0473)
Baltimore County - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Companies - Funding AllocationDelegate AumannIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0992
    (SB0672)
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Student Diabetes Management ProgramDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1033Public and Nonpublic Schools - Sexual and Physical Abuse Notification and PreventionDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1219Public Safety - Fire Police - Cecil CountyCecil County DelegationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPublic Safety (E4)
SB0086 / CH0323Public Safety - Hit and Run Suspects - Yellow Alert ProgramSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 323Judicial Proceedings
2/4/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0214
    (HB0368 / CH0360)
Civil Actions - Immunity From Liability - Emergency Medical Care for Drug OverdoseAnne Arundel County SenatorsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0230 / CH0154
    (HB0167)
Calvert County - Length of Service Award Program - Recipient BenefitsCalvert County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 154Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0361Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Bottle ClubsCalvert County SenatorsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0443 / CH0173Harford County - Charitable GamingSenator NormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 173Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0473
    (HB0948)
Baltimore County - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Companies - Funding AllocationSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0510
    (HB0274 / CH0234)
Frederick County - Gaming EventsSenator HoughVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0516 / CH0356
    (HB0745)
Public Health - Overdose Response ProgramSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 356Finance
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0526
    (HB0244 / CH0313)
Maryland Second Chance Act of 2015Senator RaskinIn the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by JudiciaryJudicial Proceedings
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0546 / CH0359Civil Actions - Immunity From Liability - Emergency Medical Care for Drug OverdoseSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 359Judicial Proceedings
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0672
    (HB0992)
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Student Diabetes Management ProgramSenator YoungIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0757 / CH0381Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Required DisclosuresChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 381Finance
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0912Kent County - Prospective Employees and Volunteers - Criminal History Records CheckSenator HersheyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0915State Personnel - Selection Test Credits - Eligible Volunteer Fire, Rescue, or Emergency Medical Services ProvidersSenator JenningsIn the House - Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/9/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.