Volunteers

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 34

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0037
    (SB0388)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, or Emergency Medical Services MembershipDelegate ClarkIn the House - Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/17/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0049General Provisions - Commemorative Months - Foster Care MonthDelegate WilsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0246
    (SB0671)
Hate Crimes - Threats and PenaltiesDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0339
    (SB0535)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Lisbon Volunteer Fire Department Ho. Co. 5-18Howard County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0425 / CH0327
    (SB0356 / CH0328)
Somerset County - Fire Companies - AppropriationsDelegate OttoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 327Environment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0627 / CH0113Calvert County - Length of Service Award Program - Death BenefitsCalvert County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 113Environment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0821
    (SB1135)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Hatzalah of BaltimoreDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2018 - 10:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0836
    (SB1184)
Creation of a State Debt – Habitat for Humanity of the ChesapeakeDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2018 - 10:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0976
    (SB0261)
Community Colleges – Vocational Certificates, Apprenticeship Training Programs, and Associate Degrees – Tuition AssistanceDelegate SteinIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0984 / CH0268
    (SB0542 / CH0269)
Carroll County - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical ServicesCarroll County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 268Environment and Transportation
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1069 / CH0582
    (SB1269)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services MembersDelegate BuckelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 582Ways and Means
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1072 / CH0031Education - Child Sexual Abuse Prevention - Instruction and TrainingDelegate WilsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 31Ways and Means
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1144
    (SB0754)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Bowie Volunteer Fire DepartmentDelegate VallarioIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1298
    (SB1178)
General Provisions - Commemorative Months - Maryland Sportsmanship MonthDelegate CarozzaIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1306
    (SB0613)
Baltimore County Board of Education - Voluntary Nonsectarian Prayer at School-Sponsored Student Events - ReferendumDelegate MetzgarIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1435Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Volunteer Fire Department PG 305-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1477
    (SB0886)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Work and Community Engagement Requirements - WaiverDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1479Privileged Communications - Critical Incident Stress Management ServicesDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryPublic Safety (E4)
SB0261
    (HB0976)
Community Colleges – Vocational Certificates, Apprenticeship Training Programs, and Associate Degrees – Tuition AssistanceSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 12:45 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2018 - 12:45 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Higher Education (F2)
SB0356 / CH0328
    (HB0425 / CH0327)
Somerset County - Fire Companies - AppropriationsSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 328Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0388
    (HB0037)
Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services MembersSenator MiddletonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0535
    (HB0339)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Lisbon Volunteer Fire Department Ho. Co. 5-18Howard County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0542 / CH0269
    (HB0984 / CH0268)
Carroll County - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical ServicesCarroll County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 269Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0569Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Bowleys Quarters Volunteer Fire DepartmentSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 3:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0613
    (HB1306)
Baltimore County Board of Education - Voluntary Nonsectarian Prayer at School-Sponsored Student Events - ReferendumSenator RobinsonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0652 / CH0198Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - RegulationSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 198Finance
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0671
    (HB0246)
Hate Crimes - Threats and PenaltiesSenator ZirkinIn the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0674Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Lansdowne Volunteer Fire DepartmentSenator KasemeyerIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 4:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 4:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0754
    (HB1144)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Bowie Volunteer Fire DepartmentSenator PetersIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0886
    (HB1477)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Work and Community Engagement Requirements - WaiverWashington County SenatorsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinancePublic Health (J1)
SB1135
    (HB0821)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Hatzalah of BaltimoreSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB1178
    (HB1298)
General Provisions - Commemorative Months - Maryland Sportsmanship MonthSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB1184
    (HB0836)
Creation of a State Debt – Habitat for Humanity of the ChesapeakeSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB1269
    (HB1069 / CH0582)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services MembersSenator MathiasIn the Senate - First Reading Budget and TaxationBudget and TaxationTaxes - Income (Q3)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 18, 2018 3:54 P.M.