Warrants

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 25

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0056Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Utility MetersDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
1/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0323
    (SB0248)
Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - CitationDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0385Criminal Procedure - Incompetency and Criminal ResponsibilityChair, Judiciary CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0545Landlord-Tenant Action - Body Attachment - Prohibition (Jared Kushner Act)Delegate AliIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0887Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Specific Individuals or Mass MurderDelegate ShoemakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0920
    (SB0705)
Public Safety - SWAT Team Activation and Deployment - ReportsDelegate MieleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0942Real Property – Body Attachments – Debt Related to Residential TenancyDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Real Property (N1)
HB1023 / CH0783
    (SB0861)
Juvenile Law – Witnesses – Body AttachmentDelegate ClippingerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 783Judiciary
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsJuvenile Law (E3)
HB1081
    (SB1050)
Civil Actions – Body Attachment – ProceduresDelegate BarronIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1383
    (SB1212)
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Expansion (Maryland Record Expungement Designed to Enhance Employment (REDEEM) Act of 2018)Delegate MosbyIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1461Criminal Procedure – Immigration – Supporting All Families Everywhere (SAFE Act)Delegate GutierrezIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1520
    (SB0766)
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Services Program - Victim NotificationDelegate VallarioIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1559Court Records - Unserved Arrest Warrant and Charging Document - Inspection by AttorneyDelegate VallarioIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1646 / CH0251
    (SB1036)
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - TransferDelegate AtterbearyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 251Judiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1726Maryland Dentistry Act - RevisionsChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0248
    (HB0323)
Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - CitationSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/1/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0442Public Safety - Maryland Electronic Telecommunications Enforcement Resource System - Body AttachmentsSenator NormanIn the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0705
    (HB0920)
Public Safety - SWAT Team Activation and Deployment - ReportsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0766
    (HB1520)
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Services Program - Victim NotificationSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0816Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First RespondersSenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0861
    (HB1023 / CH0783)
Juvenile Law - Witnesses - Body AttachmentSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB1034Human Services – State Public Assistance Eligibility – Arrest WarrantSenator HoughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB1050
    (HB1081)
Civil Actions - Body Attachment - ProceduresSenator SmithIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB1210Criminal Procedure - Extradition - Duty of Local Governments (Sanctuary for Citizens Act)Senator WaughIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesPublic Safety (E4)
SB1212
    (HB1383)
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Expansion (Maryland Record Expungement Designed to Enhance Employment (REDEEM) Act of 2018)Senator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:42 A.M.