Warranties

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0077 / CH0346
    (SB0258 / CH0347)
Condominiums - Claims Against Developers and Vendors - Unenforceability of Certain ProvisionsDelegate HolmesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 346Environment and Transportation
1/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB0434
    (SB0529)
Vehicle Manufacturers - Notice to Purchasers and Lessees - Warranty RequirementsDelegate DavisIn the Senate - Favorable with AmendmentsEconomic Matters
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1104 / CH0517Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers - Consumer Data ProtectionDelegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 517Environment and Transportation
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0258 / CH0347
    (HB0077 / CH0346)
Condominiums – Claims Against Developers and Vendors – Unenforceability of Certain ProvisionsSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 347Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationReal Property (N1)
SB0529
    (HB0434)
Vehicle Manufacturers - Notice to Purchasers and Lessees - Warranty RequirementsSenator AstleIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by FinanceFinance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB1031Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Consumer Data ProtectionSenator HoughIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 11, 2018 4:29 P.M.