Welfare

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0333 / CH0367Family Investment Program - Couples Advancing Together Pilot ProgramDelegate RosenbergApproved by the Governor - Chapter 367Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB0632Family Investment Program - State Government Hiring Plans - ApplicationDelegate Kelly, K.In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB0834Human Services - Public Assistance - Mandatory Drug TestsDelegate StocksdaleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriationsSocial Services - Generally (O1)
HB0884
    (SB0686 / CH0526)
Family Investment Program - Earned Income Disregard Pilot ProgramDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB1137
    (SB0898)
Task Force to Study the Process for Assisting Cancer Patients at Local Departments of Social ServicesDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1328
    (SB0332 / CH0455)
Estates and Trusts - Special and Supplemental Needs Trusts - Regulations by State AgenciesDelegate SmigielVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB1333Family Investment Program - Family Literacy Pilot ProgramDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB0332 / CH0455
    (HB1328)
Estates and Trusts - Special and Supplemental Needs Trusts - Regulations by State AgenciesSenator GladdenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 455Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0686 / CH0526
    (HB0884)
Family Investment Program - Earned Income Disregard Pilot ProgramSenator GaragiolaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 526Finance
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB0898
    (HB1137)
Task Force to Study the Process for Assisting Cancer Patients at Local Departments of Social ServicesSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB1059Landlord and Tenant - Application Fees - Prospective Tenants Who Receive Housing AssistanceSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.