Welfare

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 18

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0377
    (SB0513)
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury FundDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations and Judiciary)Health and Government Operations
2/12/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0685Department of Aging - Comprehensive Plan for the Aging PopulationDelegate KrimmIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elderly (O2)
HB0759Home Act of 2016Delegate LaffertyIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
HB0796
    (SB0801)
Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant Law - Actions for Repossession (Fairness and Integrity for Baltimore City Renters Act)Delegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1007 / CH0287Freedom to Vote ActDelegate LuedtkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 287Ways and Means
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1106
    (SB0921)
Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard RevisionsDelegate FrickVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Economic Matters
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1190
    (SB0894)
Human Services - Family Investment Administration - Weighted Caseload AnalysisDelegate HettlemanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0094 / CH0344Workforce Development - RevisionsChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 344Finance
1/21/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0101Maryland Transit Administration - Labor Relations - Resolution of Labor DisputesChair, Finance CommitteeIn the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0328
    (HB0220)
Criminal Procedure - ExpungementSenator ConwayIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0513
    (HB0377)
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury FundSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0546Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of RestrictionsSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB0801
    (HB0796)
Fairness and Integrity for Baltimore City Renters ActSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0880Task Force to Study Welfare Reform in MarylandSenator JenningsIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB0894
    (HB1190)
Human Services - Weighted Caseload Analysis - StudySenator KasemeyerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnFinance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0921
    (HB1106)
Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard RevisionsSenator PughVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Finance
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0939
    (HB1181 / CH0303)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Determinations of Eligibility for Long-Term Care Services - Reports and MeetingsSenator MadalenoIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsPublic Health (J1)
SB1014Maryland Clean Energy Jobs Act of 2016Senator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; WithdrawnRulesUtility Regulation (C5)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.