Wells

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0337
    (SB0514)
Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - ProhibitionDelegate Robinson, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersEnvironment (M3)
HB0341
    (SB0513)
Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing Wastewater - Prohibited ActsDelegate Robinson, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0519
    (SB0112)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Eagle Harbor Artesian Well RestorationDelegate ProctorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1126Environment - Well Drilling - Notification to MunicipalitiesDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1274Maryland Hydraulic Fracturing Moratorium and Right to Know Act of 2013Delegate MizeurIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0112
    (HB0519)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Eagle Harbor Artesian Well RestorationSenator MillerIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0513
    (HB0341)
Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing Wastewater - Prohibited ActsSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0514
    (HB0337)
Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - ProhibitionSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Environment (M3)
SB0601Maryland Hydraulic Fracturing Moratorium and Right to Know Act of 2013Senator ZirkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0854 / CH0568Environment - Gas and Oil Drilling - Financial AssuranceSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 568Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0879Natural Gas Severance Tax and Impact AccountSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.