Wells

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0449 / CH0481
    (SB0409 / CH0480)
Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - RegulationsDelegate Fraser-HidalgoEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 481Environment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment (M3)
HB0458Environment - Exploration and Production Waste and Waste From Hydraulic FracturingDelegate Robinson, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0883
    (SB0438)
Environment - Well Drilling - Notice to MunicipalitiesDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0952Public Health - Hydraulic Fracturing Chemicals - Information and FundDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0029Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - ProhibitionsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0409 / CH0480
    (HB0449 / CH0481)
Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - RegulationsSenator MontgomeryEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 480Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationEnvironment (M3)
SB0438
    (HB0883)
Environment - Well Drilling - Notice to MunicipalitiesSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0458Civil Actions - Hydraulic Fracturing Liability ActSenator ZirkinIn the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0712Natural Gas Severance Tax and Impact AccountSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.