Wells

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB1456
    (SB1128)
Offshore Drilling Liability ActDelegate BarveIn the House - Passed EnrolledJudiciary
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HJ0013Opposition to Proposed National Outer Continental Shelf Oil and Gas Leasing ProgramDelegate FlanaganIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsEnvironment (M3)
SB1029Oil and Gas Drilling and Production - RestrictionsSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB1128
    (HB1456)
Offshore Drilling Liability ActSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Passed EnrolledJudicial Proceedings
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SJ0011Coastal Area - Protection From Offshore Oil and Gas DrillingSenator MathiasIn the House - Hearing 3/30 at 11:30 a.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2018 - 11:30 a.m.
Environment (M3)

April 10, 2018 9:47 A.M.