Wicomico County

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0526
    (SB0747)
Community Colleges - Small Community Colleges - FundingDelegate KrebsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB1097
    (SB0729)
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept ProgramEastern Shore DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1352Wicomico County Board of Education - Election and Appointment of MembersWicomico County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB1359Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Limited Distillery LicenseWicomico County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1521
    (SB1140 / CH0242)
Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Youth and Civic Center LicenseDelegate AndertonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1576
    (SB1151)
Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Habitat for Humanity of Wicomico CountyDelegate Sample-HughesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1612
    (SB1042)
Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Ward Museum of Wildfowl ArtWicomico County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0145 / CH0169Wicomico County Board of Education - Election and Appointment of MembersSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 169Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
SB0728
    (HB1143)
Income Tax Credit - New Dwellings - Automatic Fire Sprinkler SystemsSenator MathiasIn the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and MeansBudget and Taxation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/11/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0729
    (HB1097)
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept ProgramSenator HersheyIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0737Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax CreditSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0738Economic Development - Maryland Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax CreditSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0747
    (HB0526)
Community Colleges - Small Community Colleges - FundingSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB1042
    (HB1612)
Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Ward Museum of Wildfowl ArtSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 10:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB1061Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting - Statewide AuthorizationSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate RulesRulesHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB1140 / CH0242
    (HB1521)
Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Youth and Civic Center LicenseSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 242Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB1151
    (HB1576)
Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Habitat for Humanity of Wicomico CountySenator EckardtIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.