Witnesses

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 30

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0078Public Service Commission - Participant CompensationDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0219 / CH0089
    (SB0216)
Workers' Compensation - Workers' Compensation Commission - Issuance of SubpoenasDelegate JamesonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 89Economic Matters
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB0235Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and Correctional OfficersDelegate Kelly, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0306 / CH0116
    (SB0337 / CH0115)
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - PenaltiesSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 116Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0364 / CH0224
    (SB0224)
State Prosecutor and Deputy State Prosecutor - Witness Immunity - Compulsory TestimonyDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 224Judiciary
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0370Uniform Act to Secure the Attendance of Witnesses From Without the State in Criminal Proceedings - News Media PrivilegeDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0454 / CH0230Gaming - Emergency Suspension of LicenseChair, Ways and Means CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 230Ways and Means
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0767
    (SB0831)
Public Health - Mental Hygiene Law - Assisted Outpatient TreatmentDelegate MurphyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0867Maryland False Claims ActDelegate AroraIn the Senate - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsJudiciary
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0908 / CH0560
    (SB0849 / CH0559)
State Board of Nursing - Nurses, Nursing Assistants, Medication Technicians, and Electrologists - Licensing, Certification, Regulation, Violations, and PenaltiesDelegate Nathan-PulliamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 560Health and Government Operations
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Health Occupations (J2)
HB0995Firearms Freedom ActDelegate DwyerIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1200 / CH0202
    (SB0752)
Public Safety - Eyewitness Identification - ProceduresDelegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 202Judiciary
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Public Safety (E4)
HB1232
    (SB0973)
Criminal Procedure - Task Force on Pretrial Risk Assessment - Detainee Electronic Information Sharing SystemDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1273
    (SB0986)
Criminal Law - Energy Drinks - Sale to and Possession by Minors ProhibitedDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1337
    (SB0798)
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury FundDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1361Joint Committee to Review the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange and Audit by the Office of Legislative AuditsDelegate SzeligaIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 12:30 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/7/2014 - 12:30 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB1528Criminal Law - Sexual Offenses - Evidence of Defendant's Past ConductDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0169Maryland Higher Education Commission - Review of Duplicative Academic Program Proposals - RevisionsSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0216
    (HB0219 / CH0089)
Workers' Compensation - Workers' Compensation Commission - Issuance of SubpoenasSenator KlausmeierVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Workers' Compensation (K1)
SB0224
    (HB0364 / CH0224)
State Prosecutor and Deputy State Prosecutor - Witness Immunity - Compulsory TestimonySenator RaskinVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0272 / CH0151
    (HB0031)
Sentencing Procedures - Statement by Victim or Victim's Representative (Alex's Law)Senator JacobsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 151Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0337 / CH0115
    (HB0306 / CH0116)
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - PenaltiesPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 115Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0461Privileged Communications - Critical Incident Stress Management ServicesSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0752
    (HB1200 / CH0202)
Public Safety - Eyewitness Identification - ProceduresSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings Public Safety (E4)
SB0798
    (HB1337)
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury FundSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0831
    (HB0767)
Public Health - Mental Hygiene Law - Assisted Outpatient TreatmentSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0849 / CH0559
    (HB0908 / CH0560)
State Board of Nursing - Nurses, Nursing Assistants, Medication Technicians, and Electrologists - Licensing, Certification, Regulation, Violations, and PenaltiesSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 559Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0860 / CH0201Public Safety - Eyewitness Identification - ProceduresSenator GladdenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 201Judicial Proceedings
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0973
    (HB1232)
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Confinement and ReleaseSenator FroshIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed (37-9)Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0986
    (HB1273)
Criminal Law - Energy Drinks - Sale to and Possession by Minors ProhibitedSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:36 P.M.