Women

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0027 / CH0212
    (SB0656)
Correctional Services - Healthy Births for Incarcerated Women ActDelegate Washington, M.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212Judiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Public Safety (E4)
HB0088
    (SB0281)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Selective Service Registration - Driver's License and Identification Card ApplicantsDelegate SchuhIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0236
    (SB0208)
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction ActDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0283
    (SB0034)
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection ActDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0358
    (SB0270)
Law Enforcement Personnel - Training - Human Trafficking OffensesDelegate SchuhIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0459 / CH0099Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician AssistantsChair, Ways and Means CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 99Ways and Means
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0792
    (SB0695)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Dental Services for Postpartum Women - CoverageDelegate KellyIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0986
    (SB0951)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - YWCA Domestic Violence Safe HouseDelegate BeidleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1211State Board of Nursing - Midwives - Licensing and RegulationDelegate KellyIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1332 / CH0653Task Force to Study Sports Injuries in High School Female AthletesDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 653Ways and Means
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1349 / CH0249
    (SB0868)
Public Safety Diversity Act of 2014Delegate BraveboyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 249Health and Government Operations
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Finance
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1544Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Serving Women Now Foundation ProjectDelegate NiemannIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2014 - 4:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0034
    (HB0283)
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection ActSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0085Health - Medical Procedures - Ultrasound OptionsSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0208
    (HB0236)
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction ActSenator KelleyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations Family Law (D4)
SB0270
    (HB0358)
Law Enforcement Personnel - Training - Human Trafficking OffensesSenator JacobsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0281
    (HB0088)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Selective Service Registration - Driver's License and Identification Card ApplicantsSenator AstleIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0656
    (HB0027 / CH0212)
Correctional Services - Healthy Births for Incarcerated Women ActSenator RaskinIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations Public Safety (E4)
SB0695
    (HB0792)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Dental Services for Postpartum Women - CoverageSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0868
    (HB1349 / CH0249)
Public Safety Diversity Act of 2014Senator BensonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Rules and Executive Nominations Public Safety (E4)
SB0944Family Law - Controlled Dangerous Substance Use During Pregnancy and Substance-Exposed Newborns - ReportingSenator ShankIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0951
    (HB0986)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - YWCA Domestic Violence Safe HouseSenator AstleIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; WithdrawnRules State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SJ0002Acknowledgment of the Sufferings of Sexually Enslaved Women ("Comfort Women") During World War IISenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:36 P.M.