Delegate Kumar P. Barve

2015 Regular Session

District 17, Montgomery County

Total Bills: 27 (Primary Sponsor: 3, Co-sponsor: 23, By Request: 1)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0746 / CH0170
    (SB0422 / CH0169)
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - South Asian American Heritage DayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 170Health and Government Operations
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimaryState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0925
    (SB0744 / CH0196)
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 - Montgomery County - Water Park at Bohrer ParkVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryPrior Authorizations (B4)
HB1238
    (SB0151)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Jewish Foundation for Group Homes RenovationsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/16/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0172
    (SB0778)
Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving VehiclesIn the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0180 / CH0227
    (SB0182)
Video Lottery Terminal Revenues - Purse Dedication Account - Standardbred Racetrack Operating Loss AssistanceApproved by the Governor - Chapter 227Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHorse Racing (C6)
HB0215
    (SB0183 / CH0477)
Education - Geographic Cost of Education - RequirementIn the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0227Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of AbuseIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorFamily Law (D4)
HB0229
    (SB0604 / CH0043)
Human Relations - Employment Discrimination - Protection for InternsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorHuman Relations (D5)
HB0295
    (SB0176)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - F. Scott Fitzgerald Theatre and Social HallIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/16/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
Co-SponsorState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0340 / CH0241
    (SB0889)
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Thurgood Marshall DayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 241Health and Government Operations
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0385
    (SB0040)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 12:30 p.m.Economic Matters
2/13/2015 - 12:30 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0421
    (SB0312)
Maryland Secure Choice Retirement Savings Program and TrustIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)Economic Matters
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Co-SponsorPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0465
    (SB0491)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Cornerstone Montgomery and Interfaith Works ProjectIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/16/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
Co-SponsorState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0467
    (SB0341)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Josiah Henson ParkIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0503
    (SB0078)
Rape Survivor Family Protection ActIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorFamily Law (D4)
HB0568
    (SB0587)
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Motor Vehicle Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory BranchesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Co-SponsorCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0606
    (SB0477 / CH0354)
Domestic Violence - Persons Eligible for ReliefIn the House - Third Reading Passed (137-0)Judiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorFamily Law (D4)
HB0725
    (SB0668)
Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of LimitationsIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0900
    (SB0492)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Cornerstone Montgomery and Interfaith Works ProjectIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/16/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
Co-SponsorState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0911
    (SB0531)
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0922
    (SB0658)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Anne L. Bronfman Center and Misler Adult Day CenterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/16/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
Co-SponsorState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0923
    (SB0490 / CH0355)
Capital Grant Program for Local School Systems With Significant Enrollment Growth or Relocatable ClassroomsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationCo-SponsorCapital Budget (B5)
HB1021
    (SB0676)
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Death with Dignity ActIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Co-SponsorPublic Health (J1)
HB1105
    (SB0761 / CH0382)
Disabled Individuals - Task Force on the Maryland ABLE ProgramVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationCo-SponsorDisabled (O3)
HB1193
    (SB0228)
Supplemental Public School Construction Matching Fund ProgramIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HJ0002
    (SJ0002)
United States Constitution - Democracy AmendmentIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules and Executive Nominations
3/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesCo-SponsorElections (G1)
HB0067 / CH0058
    (SB0220)
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State AgenciesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 58Health and Government Operations
2/4/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
RulesBy Request - OtherState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:39 P.M.