Delegate John L. Bohanan, Jr.

2014 Regular Session

District 29B, St. Mary's County

Total Bills: 31 (Primary Sponsor: 5, Co-sponsor: 25, By Request: 1)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0394Economic Development - Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - ReorganizationIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0741 / CH0533
    (SB0601 / CH0532)
Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 533Ways and Means
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation PrimaryEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB1099
    (SB0351)
Creation of a State Debt - St. Mary's County - St. Peter Claver Museum of St. Inigoes, MarylandIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2014 - 10:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1100Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2007 - St. Mary's County - SMARTCO's Computer Technology Learning CenterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryPrior Authorizations (B4)
HB1215 / CH0340
    (SB0785 / CH0339)
Higher Education - 2+2 Transfer ScholarshipApproved by the Governor - Chapter 340Ways and Means
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs PrimaryHigher Education (F2)
HB0396 / CH0503
    (SB0446 / CH0502)
Department of Disabilities - Study of Accessibility Concepts in Computer Science, Information Systems, and Information Technology Programs in Higher EducationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 503Appropriations
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Co-SponsorHigher Education (F2)
HB0740 / CH0535
    (SB0603 / CH0534)
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Cybersecurity Investment FundApproved by the Governor - Chapter 535Economic Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0742 / CH0531
    (SB0600 / CH0530)
Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 531Ways and Means
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation Co-SponsorEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0743 / CH0537
    (SB0604 / CH0536)
Income Tax Forms - Graphical Representation of General Fund ExpendituresApproved by the Governor - Chapter 537Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0770Income Tax - Military Retirement IncomeIn the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0856 / CH0259
    (SB1065)
Workgroup on Workforce Development for Community Health WorkersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 259Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0907 / CH0622Video Lottery Facility Payouts - Intercepts for Child Support PaymentsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 622Ways and Means
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorGaming (C7)
HB0917Maryland Aviation Administration - Contract Authority - Transportation CompaniesIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTransportation - Generally (R2)
HB0935
    (SB0505)
Task Force on Family Caregiving and Long-Term SupportsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHuman Relations (D5)
HB0989
    (SB0770)
Creation of a State Debt - St. Mary's County - Firemen's Heritage MuseumIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2014 - 10:00 a.m.
Co-SponsorState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1005Firearms - Handgun Permit Requirements - Retired MilitaryIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB1133Calvert County and St. Mary's County - Archery Hunting - Safety ZoneIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1142Corporate Income Tax - Rate ReductionIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1145Maintenance of Effort - Qualifying Nonrecurring Costs - Methods of ApprovalIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1163Income Tax Credit - Hiring Qualified VeteransIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1169Income Tax Credit - Unemployed Veterans - Start-Up BusinessIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1193Task Force to Study Implementation of Strategies for Preventing Sexual Exploitation of Clients by Health ProfessionalsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1194
    (SB1039)
Historically Black Colleges and Universities - EvaluationIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHigher Education (F2)
HB1209
    (SB0916)
State Retirement and Pension System - Parole and Probation Employees - Membership in Correctional Officers' Retirement SystemIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB1222 / CH0647Ruth M. Kirk Public Social Work ScholarshipApproved by the Governor - Chapter 647Ways and Means
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHigher Education (F2)
HB1262
    (SB0633)
Maryland Education CreditIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1307 / CH0451Children in Out-of-Home Placement - Annual Notice of BenefitsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 451Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorFamily Law (D4)
HB1317 / CH0652Higher Education - Maryland Technology Internship ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 652Appropriations
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHigher Education (F2)
HB1521Income Tax Checkoff - Maryland Veterans Trust FundIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1550
    (SB1109)
Creation of a State Debt - St. Mary's County - Cedar Lane Senior Living Community Project - Phase 4In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0739 / CH0612
    (SB0602)
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified CreditApproved by the Governor - Chapter 612Ways and Means
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation By Request - OtherTaxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:32 P.M.