Contact Legislator(s)

Message will be sent to James Brochin
Javascript must be enabled on your browser to use this feature. Click 'Close' to continue.

Senator James Brochin

2014 Regular Session

District 42, Baltimore County

Total Bills: 32 (Primary Sponsor: 11, Co-sponsor: 19, By Request: 2)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0136Criminal Law - Second-Degree Murder - PenaltyIn the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0163Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit and Exclusion AmountIn the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryTaxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0164
    (HB0712)
Crimes - Use of a Firearm in the Commission of a Crime - Diminution Credits and SentencingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryPublic Safety (E4)
SB0174Real Property - Right to Redemption of Leased Premises - Forms of PaymentIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryReal Property (N1)
SB0188
    (HB0128)
State Retirement and Pension System - Military Service Credit - ExceptionIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
2/6/2014 - 9:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0239Maryland Transit Administration - Audio Recordings - Requirements and LimitationsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryTransportation - Generally (R2)
SB0290 / CH0480
    (HB0384)
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of MembersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 480Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryEducation - Local Bills (F3)
SB0350 / CH0490Speed Monitoring Systems Reform Act of 2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 490Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0623
    (HB0588)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Lutherville Volunteer Fire Company Station ExpansionIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/8/2014 - 11:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0720Courts - Prosecution for Sex Offense - Evidence of Prior ActIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0943
    (HB0507)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Towson High School StadiumIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/8/2014 - 11:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0078Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Victims Under Age 21In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0143
    (HB0353)
Income Tax - Military Retirement IncomeIn the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0165
    (HB0117)
Education - Maryland School Assessment - Request for WaiverIn the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0252
    (HB0700)
Joint Committee on Fair Practices and State Personnel Oversight - Public Hearings on Workplace Bullying in State AgenciesIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations Co-SponsorState Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0283Public Safety - Handgun Permit Background Investigation - Armored Car Company EmployeesIn the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
SB0359Watershed Protection and Restoration Programs - Impervious Surface - DefinitionIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorEnvironment (M3)
SB0360Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - ProhibitionIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Co-SponsorEnvironment (M3)
SB0404 / CH0058
    (HB0099)
Maryland Uniform Commercial Code - Secured Transactions - Notice of Filing of Financing StatementApproved by the Governor - Chapter 58Finance
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Co-SponsorCommercial Law - Generally (I4)
SB0414General Assembly - Legislative Redistricting - Plans to be Introduced as a BillIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0454 / CH0168
    (HB0701 / CH0420)
Criminal Law - Child Kidnapping for the Purpose of Committing a Sexual Crime - PenaltyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 168Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0542
    (HB0294 / CH0221)
Law Enforcement Officers - Entrance-Level and In-Service Training Requirements (Christopher's Law)Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
SB0646
    (HB1253)
State Health Plan - Licensed Hospice Programs - Certificate of Need ReviewIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnFinance
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHealth Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0660 / CH0186
    (HB0667 / CH0187)
Crimes Relating to Animals - Unauthorized Surgical Devocalization of Cat or Dog - PenaltiesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 186Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0721Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Services for Children With Down Syndrome (Micah's Law)In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Health (J1)
SB0740
    (HB0915)
Election Law - General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Districting and Apportionment CommissionIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorElections (G1)
SB0914
    (HB1270)
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State CustodyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorFamily Law (D4)
SB0927
    (HB1323)
Supplemental Public School Construction Matching Fund ProgramIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB1114Criminal Procedure - Initial Appearance and Representation by the Office of the Public DefenderIn the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SJ0001 / JR0003
    (HJ0002)
Rescission of Maryland's Ratification of the Corwin Amendment to the United States ConstitutionSigned by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 3Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/31/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0333 / CH0111
    (HB0307 / CH0112)
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Burden of ProofApproved by the Governor - Chapter 111Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationFamily Law (D4)
SB0602
    (HB0739 / CH0612)
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified CreditIn the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherTaxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 10, 2014 7:22 P.M.