Delegate Ned Carey

2015 Regular Session

District 31A, Anne Arundel County

Total Bills: 32 (Primary Sponsor: 1, Co-sponsor: 25, By Request: 6)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0332
    (SB0263)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Chesapeake Arts CenterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 11:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0039
    (SB0736 / CH0379)
Public Safety - Handgun Identification Requirements - RepealIn the House - Third Reading Passed (135-2)Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0064 / CH0220Alcoholic Beverages - Local Licensing Boards - Judicial ReviewApproved by the Governor - Chapter 220Economic Matters
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorAlcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0241
    (SB0904)
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Adult Victim - PenaltyIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0464
    (SB0454)
Handgun Permits - ReciprocityIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0553
    (SB0585)
Maryland No-Fault Injured Baby FundIn the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/16/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Co-SponsorCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0727Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Wireless Telecommunications Towers - Moratorium and ReportIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0743Handgun Permits - Firearms Training Course - Renewal ApplicationIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0786 / CH0103
    (SB0613)
Self-Service Storage Facilities - Enforcement of Lien - ProceduresApproved by the Governor - Chapter 103Economic Matters
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCommercial Law - Generally (I4)
HB0842Public Safety - Honorably Discharged Veterans - Handgun PermitsIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0853Public Schools - Boards of Education - Anonymous Two-Way Text Messaging Tip ProgramsIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0917 / CH0287
    (SB0716)
Motor Vehicles - Checkpoints - Prohibition on Targeting MotorcyclesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 287Environment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0918
    (SB0727)
Public Safety - Motorcycle Profiling - TrainingIn the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0951Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Exemptions - LandlordsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0960Retire in Maryland Act of 2015In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0966Education - Community Colleges - Collective BargainingIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHigher Education (F2)
HB1008Recreational Hunting and Fishing License Applications - Voter RegistrationIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorElections (G1)
HB1072
    (SB0784)
Labor and Employment - Discrimination Based on Engagement in Lawful Activities - ProhibitionIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/6/2015 - 1:30 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1074 / CH0295Complimentary Hunting License for Former Prisoners of War or Disabled Veterans - ReciprocityApproved by the Governor - Chapter 295Environment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1080 / CH0116
    (SB0576)
9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System - Multiple-Line Telephone Systems - Direct Dial (Kari's Law)Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116Health and Government Operations
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB1094Consumer Protection - Monitoring Consumer Behavior and Shopping Habits - Required NoticeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceEconomic Matters
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1202Highway Construction and Maintenance - Use of Recycled AggregateIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCo-SponsorTransportation - Highways (R1)
HB1223
    (SB0227)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - The Arc of the Central Chesapeake RegionIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 11:00 a.m.
Co-SponsorState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1260
    (SB0927)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Southern High School Athletic ImprovementsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
Co-SponsorState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HJ0005
    (SJ0005)
Natural Resources - Goose and Duck Hunting Seasons - ExtensionIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/9/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHunting and Fishing (M2)
HJ0008
    (SJ0003)
Honoring the Surviving Human Trafficking Victims of Asia and the Pacific Islands During World War IIIn the House - Hearing 3/30 at 3:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0368 / CH0360
    (SB0214)
Civil Actions - Immunity From Liability - Emergency Medical Care for Drug OverdoseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 360Judiciary
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBy Request - CommitteeCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0939 / CH0137
    (SB0775)
Proposed Regulations - Determination of Impact on Small BusinessesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 137Economic Matters
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
FinanceBy Request - OtherState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0940 / CH0138
    (SB0774)
Office of the Business Ombudsman - State Customer Service and Business Development Efforts Training ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 138Economic Matters
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
FinanceBy Request - OtherEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0941 / CH0139
    (SB0773)
Task Force to Study Exemptions from Higher Education Ethics Requirements and Procurement Rules to Facilitate Technology TransferApproved by the Governor - Chapter 139Economic Matters
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Finance
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
By Request - OtherEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0942 / CH0140
    (SB0772)
Apprenticeship Pilot Program - Apprenticeship MarylandApproved by the Governor - Chapter 140Economic Matters
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Finance
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
By Request - OtherEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0943 / CH0141
    (SB0776)
Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - RestructuringApproved by the Governor - Chapter 141Economic Matters
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
FinanceBy Request - OtherEconomic and Community Development (C8)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:39 P.M.