Delegate Barrie S. Ciliberti

2015 Regular Session

District 4, Frederick and Carroll Counties

Total Bills: 21 (Primary Sponsor: 1, Co-sponsor: 13, By Request: 7)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0961
    (SB0511)
Women's Late-Term Pregnancy Health ActIn the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/16/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryPublic Health (J1)
HB0039
    (SB0736 / CH0379)
Public Safety - Handgun Identification Requirements - RepealIn the House - Third Reading Passed (135-2)Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0464
    (SB0454)
Handgun Permits - ReciprocityIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0466 / CH0053
    (SB0802 / CH0052)
Transportation - Dedication of Structures (Hero's Highway Act)Approved by the Governor - Chapter 53Environment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTransportation - Highways (R1)
HB0492Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection ActIn the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/16/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Health (J1)
HB0635
    (SB0032)
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Northwest Trek Conservation and Education CenterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
Co-SponsorState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0688
    (SB0149)
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Helen Smith StudioIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
Co-SponsorState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0834Junior Advancement via Association Act of 2015In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1017Election Law - Qualification of Voters - Proof of IdentityIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorElections (G1)
HB1043Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal System - Nitrogen Removal Technology - ExemptionIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationCo-SponsorEnvironment (M3)
HB1076Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of CitizenshipIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorElections (G1)
HB1105
    (SB0761 / CH0382)
Disabled Individuals - Task Force on the Maryland ABLE ProgramVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationCo-SponsorDisabled (O3)
HB1161 / CH0388Ethan Saylor Alliance for Self-Advocates as EducatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 388Health and Government Operations
4/9/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
FinanceCo-SponsorDisabled (O3)
HJ0006Buy MarylandIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/9/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0480
    (SB0590)
Small Business Personal Property Tax Relief Act of 2015In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Property (Q1)
HB0481
    (SB0588)
Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - RepealIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationEnvironment (M3)
HB0482
    (SB0592 / CH0125)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement IncomeIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0483
    (SB0589)
Motorist Tax Relief - Motor Fuel Tax - Consumer Price Index and Sales and Use Tax Equivalent Rate Adjustments - RepealIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Transportation (Q5)
HB0484
    (SB0591)
Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Phased RestorationIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTransportation - Highways (R1)
HB0486
    (SB0595 / CH0311)
Public Charter School Expansion and Improvement Act of 2015In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0487Maryland Education CreditIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Income (Q3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:39 P.M.