Delegate Robert L. Flanagan

2016 Regular Session

District 9B, Howard County

Total Bills: 29 (Primary Sponsor: 2, Co-sponsor: 16, By Request: 11)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0561Small Business Personal Property Tax Relief Act of 2016In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:30 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
PrimaryTaxes - Property (Q1)
HB0596 / CH0040State Department of Education - Hearing Aid Loan Bank Program - Age of EligibilityApproved by the Governor - Chapter 40Ways and Means
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0303
    (SB0026)
State Designations - State TartanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0324Education - Maryland High School Diploma - Civics Test RequirementIn the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0349 / CH0717
    (SB1162)
Baltimore County - Education - Career Exploration and Development Activities - Coffee (Java Act)Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 717Ways and Means
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0390
    (SB0425 / CH0387)
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Warrant Intercept Program - StatewideIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationWays and Means
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationCo-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0494 / CH0267Agriculture - Animal Shelters - Uniform Standards of Operation and Care (Animal Shelters Standards Act of 2016)Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorAgriculture (M4)
HB0525 / CH0720
    (SB0730)
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and DealersEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 720Environment and Transportation
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0777Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - ProhibitionIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0809Marijuana - Smoking or Consuming in a Vehicle or Vessel - ProhibitionIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0982
    (SB0666)
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and DealersIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Co-SponsorVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1019
    (SB0229)
Firearms - Handgun Qualification License - Live-Fire ComponentIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB1043Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road - Lane ChangesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1319
    (SB0620 / CH0415)
Commemorative Weeks - Chesapeake Bay Awareness WeekIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesCo-SponsorState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1387 / CH0709
    (SB1054 / CH0708)
Commercial Northern Snakehead Bowfishing License - EstablishmentEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 709Environment and Transportation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1598
    (SB1120)
Railroad Grade Crossings - Exempt Highway-Rail Grade Crossing PlaqueIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCo-SponsorVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1603
    (SB0937 / CH0703)
Sustainable Oyster Population and Fishery Act of 2016In the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEnvironment and Transportation
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesCo-SponsorHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1624 / CH0526
    (SB1104 / CH0525)
Transportation - Highways - Heroes HighwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 526Environment and Transportation
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
FinanceCo-SponsorTransportation - Highways (R1)
HB0449
    (SB0375)
Relief From Budget MandatesIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0450
    (SB0386)
Tax Credits - Manufacturing Empowerment ZonesIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0453Maryland Education CreditIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0455
    (SB0387)
Income Tax Exemption Amount - Elderly IndividualsIn the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0456
    (SB0382)
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - RevisionsIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationPublic Health (J1)
HB0457
    (SB0385)
Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - ReductionsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationCorporations and Associations (C1)
HB0458
    (SB0380)
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment CommissionIn the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0460
    (SB0381 / CH0146)
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Administration - Student and Residential Mortgage LoansVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Finance
By Request - AdministrationEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0461
    (SB0388)
Crimes - Criminal Gangs - Prohibitions and FundingIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0462 / CH0010
    (SB0383)
Program Open Space - Transfer Tax Repayment - Use of FundsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 10Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0464
    (SB0376 / CH0144)
Pathways in Technology Early College High (P-TECH) Schools Act of 2016In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
By Request - AdministrationPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:07 P.M.