Delegate Rick Impallaria

2017 Regular Session

District 7, Baltimore and Harford Counties

Total Bills: 35 (Primary Sponsor: 8, Co-sponsor: 27, By Request: 0)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0231 / CH0174Property Tax Credit - Disabled or Fallen Law Enforcement Officers and Rescue Workers - AlterationsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 174Ways and Means
2/7/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0485
    (SB1177 / CH0497)
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Common Direct or Indirect Sharing of ProfitVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimaryAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0610Public Safety - Handgun Permit - Applicant QualificationsIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryPublic Safety (E4)
HB0611Handguns - School Employees - Handgun Permits and Carrying Weapons on School PropertyIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryPublic Safety (E4)
HB0612Criminal Law - Distribution of Heroin or Fentanyl Resulting in DeathIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0661Public Health - Suspected Overdoses - Reporting RequirementIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryPublic Health (J1)
HB0670Harford County - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Collective BargainingIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriationsPrimaryCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0956Business Regulation - Motor Fuel Retail Service Station - Attendant RequiredIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersPrimaryBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0053Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Firearm Safety DevicesIn the House - Hearing 1/18 at 11:00 a.m.Ways and Means
1/18/2017 - 11:00 a.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0189Hospitals - Substance Use Treatment Demonstration Program - RequirementsIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHealth Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB0290 / CH0719
    (SB0536)
Maryland Transportation Authority - Third Generation-Electronic Toll Collection SystemApproved by the Governor - Chapter 719Environment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTransportation - Highways (R1)
HB0334 / CH0414
    (SB0573 / CH0415)
Local Government - Regulation of Animals - Kennel LicensesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 414Environment and Transportation
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorCounties - Generally (L1)
HB0368Hunting and Fishing Licenses and Stamps - Seniors, Veterans, and Military Personnel (Howard's Law)In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0511 / CH0535
    (SB0218 / CH0536)
Public Utilities - Water Companies and Sewage Disposal Companies - Rate Cases and ProceedingsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 535Economic Matters
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorUtility Regulation (C5)
HB0528
    (SB0420)
Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2017In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorAgriculture (M4)
HB0607
    (SB1022)
Real Property - Vacant and Abandoned Property - Expedited ForeclosureIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorReal Property (N1)
HB0859Business Regulation - Trader's and Chain Stores Licenses and Personal Property Tax - Fees and ExemptionsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0877 / CH0191
    (SB0023 / CH0190)
Handgun Permits - Alternative Expiration Date - Private Detectives, Security Guards, and Special Police OfficersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 191Judiciary
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0888Income Tax - Expensing of Business Property and Bonus Depreciation - Recoupling With Federal LawIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0911Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - RepealIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Transportation (Q5)
HB0925Criminal Law - U-47700 ("Pink") - ProhibitionIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0926 / CH0739Child Support - Health Insurance - DefinitionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 739Judiciary
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorFamily Law (D4)
HB0933General Assembly - Live and Archived Video Streaming of MeetingsIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0958Public Safety - Gun Shows - Captured Plate DataIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0962Elections - Study Commission on the Redistricting Process in MarylandIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorElections (G1)
HB1053Integrated Community Oncology Reporting ProgramIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Health and Government Operations
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Co-SponsorHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1146Labor and Employment - General Contractor Liability for Nonpayment of WagesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1160Baltimore County - Judges - Nonpartisan Elections (Baltimore County Voting Rights Act)In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Co-SponsorElections (G1)
HB1194Landlord and Tenant - Military Personnel - Limitation on Liability for RentIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorReal Property (N1)
HB1199
    (SB0865)
Vehicle Laws - School Zone Crosswalks - Traffic Control SignalsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1244Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement Income - Individuals Under the Age of 65 YearsIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1286Harford County - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Limitations in Municipal CorporationsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)
HB1400
    (SB1098)
Commercial Law - Credit Card Processors - Service AgreementsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCommercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)
HB1410Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - ExceptionIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HJ0004Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking FunctionsIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorFinancial Institutions (I1)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:20 P.M.