Delegate Mary-Dulany James

2013 Regular Session

District 34A, Harford and Cecil Counties

Total Bills: 30 (Primary Sponsor: 5, Co-sponsor: 23, By Request: 2)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0240Operating Budget - Capital Gains Tax Revenue - Appropriation to Revenue Stabilization AccountIn the House - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/5/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
PrimaryOperating Budget (B1)
HB0260
    (SB0219)
Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Humane Society Animal ShelterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0571Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Havre de Grace Opera House RenovationsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1377
    (SB0956)
State Government - Mental Health and Law Enforcement Advisory BoardIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
PrimaryPublic Health (J1)
HB1395Harford County - Hotel Rental TaxIn the House - Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Hixson)Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryTaxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)
HB0167 / CH0352
    (SB0042 / CH0436)
State Government - Commemorative Days - Maryland Emancipation DayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 352Health and Government Operations
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0309Courts - Discovery - Examination in Aid of Enforcement of Money JudgmentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0322
    (SB0222)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Yellow Dot ProgramIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0331 / CH0612
    (SB0826)
Open Meetings Act - Violations and PenaltiesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 612Health and Government Operations
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0371Income Tax Credit - Cat and Dog AdoptionIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0390 / CH0535
    (SB0741 / CH0534)
State Retirement and Pension System - Board of TrusteesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 535Appropriations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2013 - 8:30 a.m.
Co-SponsorState Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0408 / CH0258
    (SB0404 / CH0257)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Enhanced Agricultural Management EquipmentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 258Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0411
    (SB0301)
Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Maryland STEM Lab at Broad Creek Memorial Scout ReservationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
Co-SponsorState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0439Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement IncomeIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0524
    (SB0643)
Transportation Trust Fund - Use of FundsIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesAppropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
RulesCo-SponsorTransportation - Generally (R2)
HB0579Veterans' Organizations - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Use of ProceedsIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorGaming (C7)
HB0689Income Tax Credit - Unemployed Veterans - Start-Up BusinessIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0812Hunting - Certificate of Competency and Safety - Veterans and Active Duty MilitaryIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0886Motor Vehicles - Stopping on Shoulder - Warning DevicesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0892
    (SB0731)
Family Law - Protective Orders - Additional ReliefIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorFamily Law (D4)
HB0948
    (SB0708)
Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization ProgramIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Co-SponsorEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0969Commission to Consider Mental Health-Related Ways to Limit Mass Violence by Individuals with Antisocial Personality Disorders, Depressive Disorders, or Other Mental IllnessIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1029
    (SB0783)
State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic DoctorsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1119 / CH0317
    (SB0752 / CH0316)
Department of Budget and Management - Foster Youth Summer Internship Pilot ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 317Appropriations
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorSocial Services - Generally (O1)
HB1125
    (SB0388)
Victims of Crime - Identity Theft Passport - ChildrenIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1176 / CH0471
    (SB0461 / CH0470)
Primary and Secondary Education - Online Courses and Services - AccessibilityApproved by the Governor - Chapter 471Ways and Means
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1364Courts - Breach of Contract - Attorney's FeesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1494 / CH0688
    (SB0876)
Correctional Services - Standards for Correctional Facilities - FundingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 688Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0225 / CH0155
    (SB0273 / CH0154)
Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - AdministrationBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0560 / CH0005
    (SB0538)
Public-Private PartnershipsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 5Environmental Matters
2/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationEconomic and Community Development (C8)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:27 P.M.