Delegate Mary-Dulany James

2014 Regular Session

District 34A, Harford and Cecil Counties

Total Bills: 35 (Primary Sponsor: 7, Co-sponsor: 27, By Request: 1)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0644Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Historical Society of Harford County Facility RestorationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2014 - 4:00 p.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0648Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Havre de Grace Opera House RenovationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2014 - 4:00 p.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0649Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Havre de Grace Maritime MuseumIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2014 - 4:00 p.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0838 / CH0429Task Force to Study Vocational and Technical Education Programs in Harford CountyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 429Ways and Means
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0990Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable ContainersIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1060 / CH0571
    (SB0889 / CH0570)
Northeastern Maryland Additive Manufacturing Innovation AuthorityApproved by the Governor - Chapter 571Economic Matters
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB1439Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Edgewood Community Support Center Facility CompletionIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2014 - 4:00 p.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0215Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Renewal Period for Retired Law Enforcement OfficerIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0235Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and Correctional OfficersIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0331
    (SB0280)
Electricity - Smart Meters - Disclosure of Usage DataIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorUtility Regulation (C5)
HB0332Electricity - Consumer Relations - Smart MetersIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorUtility Regulation (C5)
HB0358
    (SB0270)
Law Enforcement Personnel - Training - Human Trafficking OffensesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0389 / CH0397
    (SB0730)
Maryland Transportation Authority - All-Electronic Tolling - StudyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 397Ways and Means
2/6/2014 - 2:15 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTransportation - Highways (R1)
HB0392 / CH0597Northeastern Maryland Higher Education Advisory Board - RevisionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 597Appropriations
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHigher Education (F2)
HB0396 / CH0503
    (SB0446 / CH0502)
Department of Disabilities - Study of Accessibility Concepts in Computer Science, Information Systems, and Information Technology Programs in Higher EducationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 503Appropriations
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Co-SponsorHigher Education (F2)
HB0469Speed Monitoring Systems - School Zones - Days of OperationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0659
    (SB0974)
Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Transport Through StateIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0740 / CH0535
    (SB0603 / CH0534)
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Cybersecurity Investment FundApproved by the Governor - Chapter 535Economic Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0741 / CH0533
    (SB0601 / CH0532)
Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 533Ways and Means
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation Co-SponsorEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0742 / CH0531
    (SB0600 / CH0530)
Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 531Ways and Means
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation Co-SponsorEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0743 / CH0537
    (SB0604 / CH0536)
Income Tax Forms - Graphical Representation of General Fund ExpendituresApproved by the Governor - Chapter 537Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0772 / CH0423Local Government Investments - Self-Insurance Funds and Trust Fund Accounts of Political SubdivisionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 423Appropriations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Co-SponsorCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0815
    (SB0712)
State Personnel - Service Contracts - Procurement, Audit, and Reporting RequirementsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0817Gaming - Video Lottery Operation License - Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall AirportIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorGaming (C7)
HB0910Water Quality Certification - Conowingo Dam - Required StudiesIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorEnvironment (M3)
HB0928 / CH0078
    (SB1044 / CH0077)
Public Service Commission - Competitive Retail Electricity and Gas Supply - Consumer Protection - ReportApproved by the Governor - Chapter 78Economic Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorUtility Regulation (C5)
HB1182Family Law - Protective Orders - Additional ReliefIn the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorFamily Law (D4)
HB1222 / CH0647Ruth M. Kirk Public Social Work ScholarshipApproved by the Governor - Chapter 647Ways and Means
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHigher Education (F2)
HB1262
    (SB0633)
Maryland Education CreditIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1270
    (SB0914)
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State CustodyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorFamily Law (D4)
HB1323
    (SB0927)
Public School Construction - Creative Financing StudyIn the Senate - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsAppropriations
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1355Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Department of Defense Survivor Benefits ProgramIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1502Civil Actions - Statute of Limitations for Certain SpecialtiesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1539
    (SB1096)
Maryland Port Administration - Chesapeake and Delaware Canal - Dredged Material Containment Areas - Remediation PlanIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Co-SponsorEnvironment (M3)
HB0739 / CH0612
    (SB0602)
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified CreditApproved by the Governor - Chapter 612Ways and Means
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation By Request - OtherTaxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:33 P.M.