Delegate Adrienne A. Jones

2015 Regular Session

District 10, Baltimore County

Total Bills: 35 (Primary Sponsor: 7, Co-sponsor: 23, By Request: 5)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0010
    (SB0013 / CH0319)
Institutions of Higher Education - Fully Online Distance Education - DefinitionVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimaryHigher Education (F2)
HB0046 / CH0395Joint Committee on Fair Practices and State Personnel Oversight - RevisionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 395Appropriations
2/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryState Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0130
    (SB0601 / CH0371)
African American Heritage Preservation Program - Reestablishment and RevisionsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryCapital Budget (B5)
HB0672 / CH0176
    (SB0496 / CH0175)
Maryland College Education Export Act of 2015Approved by the Governor - Chapter 176Appropriations
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimaryHigher Education (F2)
HB0702
    (SB0657)
State Personnel - Programs to Improve Employee to Supervisor or Manager RatiosIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryState Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0757
    (SB0883)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - National Center on Institutions and Alternatives ExpansionIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/16/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0936 / CH0290Public-Private Partnership Agreements - Construction Contracts - Security RequirementsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 290Environment and Transportation
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0122Task Force to Study the Impact of State and Local Taxes on Small BusinessesIn the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0241
    (SB0904)
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Adult Victim - PenaltyIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0282
    (SB0091)
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial StudiesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/20/2015 - 12:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorElderly (O2)
HB0298 / CH0413Education - Student Data Privacy Act of 2015Approved by the Governor - Chapter 413Ways and Means
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0381
    (SB0257)
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Management ToolIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorAgriculture (M4)
HB0385
    (SB0040)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 12:30 p.m.Economic Matters
2/13/2015 - 12:30 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0503
    (SB0078)
Rape Survivor Family Protection ActIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorFamily Law (D4)
HB0571 / CH0436Institutions of Higher Education - Sexual Assault - Policy and SurveyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 436Appropriations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHigher Education (F2)
HB0582
    (SB0367)
Circuit Court Judges - Selection, Qualifications, and Term of OfficeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0595
    (SB0529)
Special Elections for United States Senate Vacancies ActIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorElections (G1)
HB0667Higher Education Institutions - Sexual Assault, Violence, and Stalking - Prevention and Outreach PoliciesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Co-SponsorHigher Education (F2)
HB0692College Savings Plans of Maryland - Maryland College Savings Account Plan - AuthorizationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHigher Education (F2)
HB0749
    (SB0817)
Higher Education - Sexual Assault Policies - ReportingIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHigher Education (F2)
HB0799 / CH0279Higher Education - Veterans and Dependents Nonresident Tuition - Compliance With Federal LawApproved by the Governor - Chapter 279Ways and Means
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorHigher Education (F2)
HB0844 / CH0106Maryland Small Business Development Financing Authority - Small Business Surety Bond ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 106Economic Matters
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0863Criminal Law - Hazing - Elements and PenaltiesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0923
    (SB0490 / CH0355)
Capital Grant Program for Local School Systems With Significant Enrollment Growth or Relocatable ClassroomsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationCo-SponsorCapital Budget (B5)
HB0949
    (SB0471)
Task Force to Study the Provision of Health Care Coverage to Uninsured MarylandersIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Health (J1)
HB0966Education - Community Colleges - Collective BargainingIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHigher Education (F2)
HB0980
    (SB0340)
Election Law - Voting Rights - Ex-FelonsVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorElections (G1)
HB1051
    (SB0424)
Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal WorkIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1105
    (SB0761 / CH0382)
Disabled Individuals - Task Force on the Maryland ABLE ProgramVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationCo-SponsorDisabled (O3)
HB1195
    (SB0877)
Fair Foreclosure Act of 2015In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorReal Property (N1)
HB0939 / CH0137
    (SB0775)
Proposed Regulations - Determination of Impact on Small BusinessesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 137Economic Matters
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
FinanceBy Request - OtherState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0940 / CH0138
    (SB0774)
Office of the Business Ombudsman - State Customer Service and Business Development Efforts Training ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 138Economic Matters
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
FinanceBy Request - OtherEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0941 / CH0139
    (SB0773)
Task Force to Study Exemptions from Higher Education Ethics Requirements and Procurement Rules to Facilitate Technology TransferApproved by the Governor - Chapter 139Economic Matters
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Finance
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
By Request - OtherEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0942 / CH0140
    (SB0772)
Apprenticeship Pilot Program - Apprenticeship MarylandApproved by the Governor - Chapter 140Economic Matters
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Finance
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
By Request - OtherEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0943 / CH0141
    (SB0776)
Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - RestructuringApproved by the Governor - Chapter 141Economic Matters
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
FinanceBy Request - OtherEconomic and Community Development (C8)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:39 P.M.