Contact Legislator(s)

Message will be sent to Jazz Lewis
Javascript must be enabled on your browser to use this feature. Click 'Close' to continue.

Delegate Jazz Lewis

2017 Regular Session

District 24, Prince George's County

Total Bills: 5 (Primary Sponsor: 3, Co-sponsor: 2, By Request: 0)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB1525
    (SB1025)
Criminal Procedure - Victim Notification - Dissemination and National StandardsIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPrimaryCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1564
    (SB0659)
Task Force on Practices and Procedures on Solitary ConfinementIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryPublic Safety (E4)
HB1633
    (SB1162)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Capitol Heights Municipal Multiservice CenterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/13/2017 - 11:30 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0001
    (SB0230)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Economic Matters
2/10/2017 - 12:30 p.m.
Finance
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1422
    (SB0296)
Income Tax Checkoff - Maryland Veterans Trust FundIn the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)

November 28, 2017 1:20 P.M.