HB0018
|
Education - Reporting Arrests of Students - Alterations |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Judiciary
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB0142
|
Election Law - Polling Places - Establishing Voter Identity (Voter Privacy Act of 2024) |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Ways and Means
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB0164
|
Election Law - Voter Registration List - Absentee Voters (Absentee Ballot Transparency Act of 2024) |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Ways and Means
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB0192
|
Elections - In-Person Voting - Proof of Identity |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Ways and Means
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB0202
|
Election Law - Absentee Ballots - Signature Requirements and Verification |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Ways and Means
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB0206
|
Education - Student Behavior - Parent and Guardian Notice and Required Counseling (Parent and Guardian Accountability Act) |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Ways and Means
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB0217
|
Vehicle Laws - Cannabis Use in Motor Vehicle With Minor Occupant - Prohibition |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Judiciary
1/24/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB0220
|
Homestead Property Tax Credit - Calculation of Credit for Dwelling Purchased by First-Time Homebuyer |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Ways and Means
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB0799
|
Correctional Services - Home Detention - Removal |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Judiciary
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB0936
|
Department of Natural Resources - Issuance of Salvage Title for Abandoned or Sunken Vessels - Authorization |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Environment and Transportation
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB0047 (SB0381)
|
Education - Interscholastic and Intramural Junior Varsity and Varsity Teams - Designation Based on Sex (Fairness In Girls' Sports Act) |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
|
- Ways and Means
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB0287 (SB0342)
|
Property Tax - Renters' Property Tax Relief Program - Assets Calculation |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
|
- Ways and Means
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Budget and Taxation
|
HB0304 (SB0039)
|
Gun Theft Felony Act of 2024 |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Judiciary
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB0310 (SB0044)
|
Safe Communities Act of 2024 |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Judiciary
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB0316 (SB0028)
|
Crimes and Corrections - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2024) |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Judiciary
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB0319 (SB0052)
|
Juvenile Justice Restoration Act of 2024 |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 12:00 p.m.
|
- Judiciary
2/08/2024 - 12:00 PM
|
|
HB0320 (SB0396)
|
Criminal Procedure - Stops and Searches - Cannabis Odor and Admission of Evidence (Drug-Free Roadways Act of 2024) |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Judiciary
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB0375 (SB0156)
|
Port of Baltimore - Renaming |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
|
- Environment and Transportation
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Finance
|
HB0484
|
Constitutional Amendment - Fee or Tax Rate Increases - Yea and Nay Vote of General Assembly Required (Taxpayer Disclosure and Protection Act) |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Ways and Means
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB0713
|
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification for Military Retirement Income - Individuals Under the Age of 55 |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Ways and Means
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB0715 (SB0533)
|
Fishing and Hunting Licenses and Trout Stamps - Complimentary Licenses and Stamp Exemption - Veterans Determined to be Unemployable |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
- Environment and Transportation
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
HB0791 (SB0552)
|
Operating Budget - Funding - Scholarships for Nonpublic School Students |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
|
- Appropriations
2/20/2024 - 12:00 PM
|
|
HB0803 (SB0748)
|
Income Tax - Alteration of Brackets and Rates (Economic Prosperity Act of 2024) |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Ways and Means
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB0955
|
Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - Repeal |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Ways and Means
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB1025 (SB0841)
|
Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax Rates, Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax, and Farebox Recovery Requirement (Transportation Equity, Fairness, and Privacy Act of 2024) |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
|
- Ways and Means
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM -
Environment and Transportation
|
|
HB1167 (SB1090)
|
Maryland Center for School Safety - Secure Schools Emergency Response Grant Program - Established |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
- Ways and Means
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM -
Appropriations
|
- Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
HB1219 (SB1024)
|
Public Schools - Cardiac Emergency Action Plan - Requirements |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
- Ways and Means
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
HB1237
|
State Department of Education - Task Force to Study the Maryland Online Special Education System |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
- Ways and Means
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
HB1257 (SB0917)
|
Public Schools - Restorative Practices Schools - Comprehensive Plan |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
- Ways and Means
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
HB1493 (SB1145)
|
Public and Nonpublic Schools – Child Sex Offenders – Prohibition on In–Person Attendance |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
|
- Rules and Executive Nominations
|
|