Delegate Herb McMillan

2017 Regular Session

District 30A, Anne Arundel County

Delegate Herb McMillan
Annapolis Address:164 House Office Building
6 Bladen Street
Annapolis, MD 21401

Phone: 410-841-3211 | 301-858-3211 | Toll-free in MD: 1-800-492-7122 ext. 3211
Fax: 410-841--3386
Interim Address:164 House Office Building
6 Bladen Street
Annapolis, MD 21401

Phone: 410-841-3211 | 301-858-3211
Fax: 410-841--3386
Contact:Contact Online or send email to: herb.mcmillan@house.state.md.us
Tenure:First elected to the Maryland House of Delegates, 2002. Member of the House, January 8,2003 to January 10, 2007. Re-elected to the House in 2010. Member of the House January 12, 2011 to January 14, 2015 representing District 30, Anne Arundel County. Representing District 30A, Anne Arundel County, beginning January 14, 2015.
Current Assignments:2015- Chief Deputy Minority Whip
2017- Environment and Transportation Committee
2017- Environment Subcommittee of the Environment and Transportation Committee
2017- Local Government and Bi-County Agencies Subcommittee of the Environment and Transportation Committee
2011- Maryland Veterans Caucus
Party Affiliation:Republican

January 13, 2017 12:00 P.M.