Senator Thomas V. Mike Miller, Jr.

2013 Regular Session

District 27, Prince George's and Calvert Counties

Total Bills: 25 (Primary Sponsor: 9, Co-sponsor: 12, By Request: 4)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0112
    (HB0519)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Eagle Harbor Artesian Well RestorationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0113Creation of a State Debt - Calvert County - North Beach Pier ImprovementsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0304 / CH0223Calvert County - Election Judges - CompensationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 223Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryElections (G1)
SB0656 / CH0516
    (HB0822)
Calvert County - Property Tax - Natural Gas FacilityApproved by the Governor - Chapter 516Budget and Taxation
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0754Hunting - Schools - Expanded Safety ZoneIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledJudicial ProceedingsPrimaryHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0829 / CH0422Transportation Trust Fund - Use of FundsAssigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 422Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Ways and Means
PrimaryTransportation - Generally (R2)
SB0830Transportation Financing ActIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
PrimaryTaxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0857 / CH0569
    (HB1131 / CH0570)
Commission on the Establishment of a Maryland Educators Service MemorialApproved by the Governor - Chapter 569Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB1017
    (HB1378)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Bethel Recreation CenterIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0027 / CH0434
    (HB0385 / CH0435)
Chesapeake Conservation Corps Program - Funding ExtensionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 434Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0162Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Transition of Control - Termination of ContractsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersJudicial Proceedings
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorReal Property (N1)
SB0177
    (HB0120)
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - The Jane Hanson National MemorialIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0234Office of the Attorney General - Establishment of a Consumer Affairs Satellite Office in Prince George's CountyIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0461 / CH0470
    (HB1176 / CH0471)
Primary and Secondary Education - Online Courses and Services - AccessibilityApproved by the Governor - Chapter 470Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0545Legislative Immunity - Prosecutions for BriberyIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0546Immunity of Local Government Officials - Prosecutions for BriberyIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0549Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Multiuse FieldsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
Co-SponsorState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0587 / CH0503Higher Education - Charles W. Riley Firefighter and Ambulance and Rescue Squad Member ScholarshipApproved by the Governor - Chapter 503Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHigher Education (F2)
SB0631 / CH0510
    (HB0815)
Hotel Rental Tax - Exemption - Lodging at a Corporate Training CenterApproved by the Governor - Chapter 510Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)
SB1037
    (HB1513 / CH0420)
Public Safety - Response to a State Disaster or Emergency - Licensing and TaxesIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCo-SponsorBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SJ0003Crisis in Waiting Periods for Veterans with Disabilities to Receive Services from the Federal Veterans Benefits AdministrationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCo-SponsorPublic Health (J1)
SB0273 / CH0154
    (HB0225 / CH0155)
Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2013 - 1:45 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
By Request - AdministrationBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0275
    (HB0226 / CH0003)
Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationEnvironment (M3)
SB0277
    (HB0229 / CH0004)
State Aid for Public Education - Certification of Net Taxable IncomeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0278 / CH0001
    (HB0227 / CH0002)
Maryland Employment Advancement Right Now (EARN) ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 1Finance
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBy Request - AdministrationPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:27 P.M.