Delegate James E. Proctor, Jr.

2013 Regular Session

District 27A, Prince George's and Calvert Counties

Total Bills: 29 (Primary Sponsor: 4, Co-sponsor: 23, By Request: 2)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0503Income Tax - Military Retirement IncomeIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0519
    (SB0112)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Eagle Harbor Artesian Well RestorationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1378
    (SB1017)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Bethel Recreation CenterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1380Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2003 - Prince George's County - Bethel Recreation CenterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryPrior Authorizations (B4)
HB0103 / CH0217
    (SB0245 / CH0216)
School Buildings - Solar Technology - Design Development DocumentsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 217Health and Government Operations
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0107
    (SB0539)
Firearms - Detachable Magazines - Maximum Capacity for AmmunitionIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2013 - 12:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0322
    (SB0222)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Yellow Dot ProgramIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0381
    (SB0495)
General Assembly Members - Business Communications as Private Citizens - NoticeIn the House - First Reading Environmental MattersEnvironmental MattersCo-SponsorState Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0408 / CH0258
    (SB0404 / CH0257)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Enhanced Agricultural Management EquipmentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 258Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0440
    (SB0048)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement IncomeIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0524
    (SB0643)
Transportation Trust Fund - Use of FundsIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesAppropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
RulesCo-SponsorTransportation - Generally (R2)
HB0564
    (SB0498)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification and Credit - Creation of a Qualifying Business EnterpriseIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
Economic Matters
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0569Environment - Wastewater Treatment Facilities - Financial Assistance StudyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironmental Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorEnvironment (M3)
HB0578
    (SB0023)
Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care PremiumsIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0667 / CH0262
    (SB0422 / CH0261)
Public School Employees - Collective Bargaining - Representation FeesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 262Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0789
    (SB0715 / CH0309)
Maryland Highway Safety Act of 2013In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0952
    (SB0782)
Correctional Services - Inmate Telephone Services - Legal CounselIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0969Commission to Consider Mental Health-Related Ways to Limit Mass Violence by Individuals with Antisocial Personality Disorders, Depressive Disorders, or Other Mental IllnessIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1119 / CH0317
    (SB0752 / CH0316)
Department of Budget and Management - Foster Youth Summer Internship Pilot ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 317Appropriations
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorSocial Services - Generally (O1)
HB1138
    (SB0778)
Correctional Services - Inmate Welfare Fund - Telephone Financial AssistanceIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB1183 / CH0148Public Health - Retail Establishments - Use of Toilet Facilities by CustomersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 148Health and Government Operations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Health (J1)
HB1247State Government - Frederick Douglass and Harriet Tubman Memorial Statues - Placement and CommissionIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1292 / CH0411Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses and AppealsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 411Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1320 / CH0413Baltimore City and Baltimore County - Child in Need of Supervision Pilot Program - ExtensionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 413Judiciary
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorJuvenile Law (E3)
HB1337 / CH0530
    (SB0702 / CH0529)
Maryland Public Art Initiative Program - Selection of Art for Capital ProjectsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 530Health and Government Operations
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB1344Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 - Prince George's County - Prince George's County Fire DepartmentIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrior Authorizations (B4)
HB1494 / CH0688
    (SB0876)
Correctional Services - Standards for Correctional Facilities - FundingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 688Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0295
    (SB0276 / CH0156)
Death Penalty Repeal and Appropriation from Savings to Aid Survivors of Homicide VictimsIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/14/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0863
    (SB0841 / CH0428)
Higher Education Fair Share ActVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationState Government - Personnel (P4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:27 P.M.