Former Delegate James E. Proctor, Jr.

District 27A


Total Bills: 37 (Primary Sponsor: 3, Co-sponsor: 32, By Request: 2)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0276
    (SB0045)
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Benedict Volunteer Fire Department and Rescue Squad and Auxiliary FacilityIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 10:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0714Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement IncomeIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1153State Highway Administration - Signs Along State Highways - Public LibrariesIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPrimaryTransportation - Highways (R1)
HB0130
    (SB0601 / CH0371)
African American Heritage Preservation Program - Reestablishment and RevisionsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCapital Budget (B5)
HB0158 / CH0403
    (SB0243)
State Personnel and Procurement - Service Contracts - Reporting and Audit RequirementsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 403Appropriations
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0196
    (SB0072)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Selective Service Registration - Driver's License and Identification Card ApplicantsIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0197 / CH0406
    (SB0295)
Prince George's County - Education - Youth Wellness Leadership Pilot ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 406Ways and Means
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0198
    (SB0294)
Education - Youth Wellness Leadership Pilot ProgramIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansCo-SponsorEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0215
    (SB0183 / CH0477)
Education - Geographic Cost of Education - RequirementIn the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0239
    (SB0271)
Election Law - Use of Campaign Funds for Meeting and Conference ExpensesIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsWays and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorElections (G1)
HB0244 / CH0313
    (SB0526)
Maryland Second Chance Act of 2015Approved by the Governor - Chapter 313Judiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0304 / CH0314
    (SB0652)
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of RecordsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 314Judiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0340 / CH0241
    (SB0889)
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Thurgood Marshall DayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 241Health and Government Operations
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0381
    (SB0257)
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Management ToolIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorAgriculture (M4)
HB0385
    (SB0040)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 12:30 p.m.Economic Matters
2/13/2015 - 12:30 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0401Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Minority Business Reporting RequirementIn the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 2:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0439
    (SB0685 / CH0046)
Family Law - Information and Services for Foster Children and Former Foster ChildrenVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorFamily Law (D4)
HB0501 / CH0426
    (SB0427)
Criminal Procedure - Victims of Crime - Notification Regarding DNA ProfileApproved by the Governor - Chapter 426Judiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0535 / CH0430
    (SB0538)
Blind or Visually Impaired Children - Individualized Education Programs - Orientation and Mobility InstructionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 430Ways and Means
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0549 / CH0093
    (SB0561)
Video Lottery Facility Payouts - Intercepts for Restitution PaymentsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 93Ways and Means
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0572
    (SB0400)
State Government - Commemorative Months - Alzheimer's and Brain Awareness MonthIn the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/16/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0643
    (SB0567 / CH0366)
Department of Human Resources - State Child Welfare System - ReportVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorChildren (O4)
HB0651Personal Property Reports - Exemption and AffidavitIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansCo-SponsorTaxes - Property (Q1)
HB0656Electricity - Energy Storage - Fuel Cells (Stored Energy and Power (StEP) Act)In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorUtility Regulation (C5)
HB0668Education - Due Process Hearings for Children With Disabilities - Attorney's FeesIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0686Income Tax Checkoff - Maryland Veterans Trust FundIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesWays and Means
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesCo-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0695Public Safety - Vertical Reciprocating Conveyors - Safety StandardsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersCo-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0702
    (SB0657)
State Personnel - Programs to Improve Employee to Supervisor or Manager RatiosIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0889Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Waiting Period for Acquittal, Nolle Prosequi, or DismissalIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0970
    (SB0689 / CH0047)
Prince George's County - Transfer Tax - Deputy SheriffsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
HB1083
    (SB0550)
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting TimeIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorFamily Law (D4)
HB1195
    (SB0877)
Fair Foreclosure Act of 2015In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorReal Property (N1)
HB1246
    (SB0916)
Maryland Law Enforcement Communications Technology Procurement Task ForceIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCo-SponsorState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1253
    (SB0910 / CH0208)
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Entry-Level Commercial Truck Driver's License Holders - StudyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCo-SponsorInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
HJ0002
    (SJ0002)
United States Constitution - Democracy AmendmentIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules and Executive Nominations
3/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesCo-SponsorElections (G1)
HB0482
    (SB0592 / CH0125)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement IncomeIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0487Maryland Education CreditIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Income (Q3)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 15, 2015 12:14 P.M.