Delegate Pam Queen

2016 Regular Session

District 14, Montgomery County

Total Bills: 13 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 13, By Request: 0)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0264 / CH0480Task Force to Investigate the Challenges of and Opportunities for Minorities in BusinessApproved by the Governor - Chapter 480Economic Matters
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0420 / CH0522
    (SB0417 / CH0521)
Individuals With Disabilities - Minimum Wage and Community Integration (Ken Capone Equal Employment Act)Approved by the Governor - Chapter 522Economic Matters
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0431 / CH0039
    (SB0355)
Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - EstablishmentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 39Health and Government Operations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorDisabled (O3)
HB0511 / CH0058
    (SB0252 / CH0057)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Former Foster Care Adolescents - Dental CareApproved by the Governor - Chapter 58Health and Government Operations
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Health (J1)
HB0580
    (SB0472)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActIn the Senate - Rereferred to FinanceEconomic Matters
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
FinanceCo-SponsorPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0595
    (SB0497)
Behavioral Health Community Providers - Keep the Door Open ActIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesCo-SponsorPublic Health (J1)
HB0849 / CH0175
    (SB0182 / CH0174)
Public Safety - Rental Dwelling Units - Carbon Monoxide AlarmsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 175Environment and Transportation
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0998 / CH0461
    (SB1020 / CH0460)
State Board of Physicians - Physician Licensing ReciprocityApproved by the Governor - Chapter 461Health and Government Operations
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1004 / CH0639Equal Pay Commission - EstablishmentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 639Economic Matters
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1217 / CH0505
    (SB0899)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Specialty Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Services - ParityApproved by the Governor - Chapter 505Health and Government Operations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Health (J1)
HB1342
    (SB0945 / CH0512)
Drunk Driving Reduction Act of 2016 (Noah's Law)In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorVehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB1378 / CH0324
    (SB1007 / CH0323)
Maryland Small Business Retirement Savings Program and TrustApproved by the Governor - Chapter 324Economic Matters
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationCo-SponsorPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1624 / CH0526
    (SB1104 / CH0525)
Transportation - Highways - Heroes HighwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 526Environment and Transportation
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
FinanceCo-SponsorTransportation - Highways (R1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:09 P.M.