Delegate April Rose

2015 Regular Session

District 5, Carroll County

Total Bills: 16 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 15, By Request: 1)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0009 / CH0393
    (SB0105)
Maryland Licensure of Direct-Entry Midwives ActApproved by the Governor - Chapter 393Health and Government Operations
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0094
    (SB0051 / CH0145)
Commission on African American History and Culture - DutiesIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesCo-SponsorState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0243 / CH0344
    (SB0350 / CH0343)
Procurement - Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprises - Participation GoalApproved by the Governor - Chapter 344Health and Government Operations
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0375 / CH0417
    (SB0403)
Education - Maryland Council on Advancement of School-Based Health CentersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 417Health and Government Operations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0658
    (SB0344 / CH0342)
Public Health - Emergency and Allergy Treatment ProgramVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Co-SponsorPublic Health (J1)
HB0674 / CH0266
    (SB0852)
Public Information Act - List of Contact Information for Governmental Unit RepresentativesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 266Health and Government Operations
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0745
    (SB0516 / CH0356)
Public Health - Overdose Response ProgramVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Health (J1)
HB0755 / CH0136
    (SB0695 / CH0135)
General Provisions - Public Information Act - Enforcement, Fees, and ExemptionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 136Health and Government Operations
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0887
    (SB0606 / CH0372)
Health Insurance - Abuse-Deterrent Opioid Analgesic Drug Products - CoverageVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorInsurance - Health (C3)
HB0896 / CH0464
    (SB0607)
Joint Committee on Behavioral Health and Opioid Use DisordersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 464Health and Government Operations
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Health (J1)
HB0978 / CH0112HIV Testing - Informed Consent and Pretest Requirements - ModificationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 112Health and Government Operations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Health (J1)
HB0999 / CH0468
    (SB0723)
Certified Nurse Practitioners - Authority to PracticeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 468Health and Government Operations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1080 / CH0116
    (SB0576)
9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System - Multiple-Line Telephone Systems - Direct Dial (Kari's Law)Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116Health and Government Operations
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB1161 / CH0388Ethan Saylor Alliance for Self-Advocates as EducatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 388Health and Government Operations
4/9/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
FinanceCo-SponsorDisabled (O3)
HB1290 / CH0309Medicaid Managed Care Organizations - Pharmacy Networks - PlanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 309Health and Government Operations
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/13/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
Co-SponsorPublic Health (J1)
HB0939 / CH0137
    (SB0775)
Proposed Regulations - Determination of Impact on Small BusinessesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 137Economic Matters
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
FinanceBy Request - OtherState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.