Delegate David D. Rudolph

2013 Regular Session

District 34B, Cecil County

Total Bills: 30 (Primary Sponsor: 12, Co-sponsor: 17, By Request: 1)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0695 / CH0383Homeowner's Insurance - Anti-Concurrent Causation Clause - Notice and StudyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 383Economic Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0705Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Boys & Girls Club of Cecil County Northeast Renovation ProjectIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0796
    (SB0427)
Income Tax Credit - Agricultural Land - Diminution in Value of Real PropertyIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0830 / CH0141Alternatives to the General Educational Development Tests - StudyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 141Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0996
    (SB0895)
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Artificial Reef InitiativeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1034Creation of a State Debt - Charlestown - Cecil Inn RenovationsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1132 / CH0074
    (SB0749 / CH0073)
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Operational ChangesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 74Economic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1135
    (SB0687)
Limited Lines - Travel InsuranceIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1205 / CH0407Study of Captive InsurersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 407Economic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1294Procurements by Maryland Department of Transportation - Accidental Death and Dismemberment Benefits RequiredIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsPrimaryState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1460
    (SB1010)
Children with Developmental Disabilities in State Custody - Continuation of Placement and ServicesIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPrimaryFamily Law (D4)
HB1503Horse Racing - Purse Dedication Account - Annual Grant to Fair HillIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansPrimaryHorse Racing (C6)
HB0089
    (SB0008 / CH0161)
Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Infrastructure Replacement SurchargeIn the Senate - First Reading FinanceEconomic Matters
1/24/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
FinanceCo-SponsorUtility Regulation (C5)
HB0128 / CH0026
    (SB0158 / CH0025)
Homestead Tax Credit - Eligibility Verification and ApplicationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 26Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Property (Q1)
HB0262
    (SB0348)
Criminal Law - Distribution of Faked Controlled Dangerous Substance - Substantially Similar Chemical StructureIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0322
    (SB0222)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Yellow Dot ProgramIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0408 / CH0258
    (SB0404 / CH0257)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Enhanced Agricultural Management EquipmentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 258Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0569Environment - Wastewater Treatment Facilities - Financial Assistance StudyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironmental Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorEnvironment (M3)
HB0578
    (SB0023)
Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care PremiumsIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0669 / CH0381
    (SB0447)
Business Regulation - Introduction of Additives into Gasoline - AuthorizationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 381Economic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0713 / CH0636Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Human TraffickingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 636Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0756
    (SB0860)
State Birds - Oriole and RavenIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0778 / CH0332
    (SB0899 / CH0331)
Local Government - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - DistributionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 332Health and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0917Real Property - Property Used for Methamphetamine Production - Disclosure and QuarantineIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
Co-SponsorReal Property (N1)
HB0974Election Law - Subsequent Election Absentee Ballot ListIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorElections (G1)
HB1084 / CH0323
    (SB0797 / CH0322)
Thermal Energy - Task Force and RegulationsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 323Economic Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorUtility Regulation (C5)
HB1156
    (SB0819)
Maryland Contributory Negligence ActIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1173Small Business Energy Assistance ActIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEconomic Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesCo-SponsorUtility Regulation (C5)
HB1297 / CH0330
    (SB0897 / CH0329)
Consumer Protection - Security Freezes - Children in Foster Care SettingsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 330Economic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0225 / CH0155
    (SB0273 / CH0154)
Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - AdministrationBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:27 P.M.