Former Delegate Andrew A. Serafini

District 2A


Total Bills: 7 (Primary Sponsor: 1, Co-sponsor: 6, By Request: 0)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0192Occupational Safety and Health - Inspections and Assessments of Civil Penalties - LimitationsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic MattersPrimaryPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0065
    (SB0224)
Education - Maintenance of Effort - Lease Payment ExclusionIn the House - Hearing 2/05 at 2:15 p.m.Ways and Means
2/5/2015 - 2:15 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0074 / CH0397Walter Sondheim Jr. Public Service Internship Scholarship Program - Expansion of ScopeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 397Ways and Means
2/5/2015 - 2:15 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHigher Education (F2)
HB0174Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - RepealIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Transportation (Q5)
HB0194
    (SB0044 / CH0320)
Vehicle Laws - Maximum Speed Limits on HighwaysVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0221
    (SB0073)
Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and FairnessIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0241
    (SB0904)
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Adult Victim - PenaltyIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 15, 2015 12:12 P.M.