Delegate Darren M. Swain

2013 Regular Session

District 24, Prince George's County

Total Bills: 27 (Primary Sponsor: 6, Co-sponsor: 20, By Request: 1)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB1220 / CH0409Invalidation and Destruction of Unexecuted Warrant, Summons, or Other Criminal Process - Failure to Appear DesignationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 409Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1232
    (SB0946)
Issuance of Search Warrant by Electronic Means Act of 2013In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1381
    (SB0953)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - City of Seat Pleasant Public Works FacilityIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1436
    (SB0967)
Business Regulation - Retail Service Stations - Video Cameras RequiredIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersEconomic MattersPrimaryBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1525
    (SB1044)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Lake Arbor Center Water and Sewage Connection ProjectIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriationsPrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1526
    (SB1045)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Lake Arbor Capital ImprovementsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriationsPrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0627
    (SB0850)
Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol TestingIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorVehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB0689Income Tax Credit - Unemployed Veterans - Start-Up BusinessIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0690 / CH0306
    (SB0679 / CH0305)
Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders CouncilApproved by the Governor - Chapter 306Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Health (J1)
HB0789
    (SB0715 / CH0309)
Maryland Highway Safety Act of 2013In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0870Criminal Procedure - Confidentiality of Police and Court Records Pertaining to MinorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0909 / CH0650
    (SB0872)
Criminal Procedure - Venue for Prosecution of Murder and ManslaughterApproved by the Governor - Chapter 650Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0916 / CH0651
    (SB0791)
Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement GuidanceApproved by the Governor - Chapter 651Judiciary
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorJuvenile Law (E3)
HB1006Criminal Records - Shielding - Nonviolent Misdemeanor ConvictionsIn the Senate - Special Order until 11:55 (Senator Brochin) Adopted (28-19) Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1069Education - Beginning of School Year - After Labor DayIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1077Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Reporting Lost or StolenIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB1144Junk Dealers and Scrap Metal Processors - Shopping Carts and Metal PipingIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1172
    (SB0806)
Alcoholic Beverages Sales - Prohibition on Use of Self-Scanning Cash RegistersIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorAlcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB1186Task Force on the Prevention of Child Abuse and NeglectIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorFamily Law (D4)
HB1204
    (SB0683)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of WagesIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1228Commission to Study the Disproportionate Justice Impact on MinoritiesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1230
    (SB0490)
Domestic Violence - Persons Eligible for Relief and Orders to Vacate HomeIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1408 / CH0417Family Law - Criminal History Records Checks - Student TeachersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 417Judiciary
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorFamily Law (D4)
HB1410
    (SB0952)
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2012 - Prince George's County - Labor of Love Learning CenterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrior Authorizations (B4)
HB1498
    (SB1060)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Palmer Park Boys & Girls ClubIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1523Public Safety - DNA Samples and Records - Collection, Use, Storage, and ExpungementIn the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0767 / CH0562
    (SB0820 / CH0561)
Animal Welfare - Spay/Neuter Fund - EstablishmentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 562Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - OtherAgriculture (M4)

Denotes enacted legislation

October 30, 2013 7:50 A.M.