Delegate Joseph F. Vallario, Jr.

2013 Regular Session

District 27A, Prince George's and Calvert Counties

Total Bills: 28 (Primary Sponsor: 1, Co-sponsor: 26, By Request: 1)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB1175 / CH0673
    (SB0721)
Police Training Commission - Membership - Police Chiefs' Association of Prince George's CountyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 673Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPrimaryPublic Safety (E4)
HB0078
    (SB0160)
Civil Actions - Personal Injury or Death Caused by Dog - Rebuttable PresumptionIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
1/30/2013 - 2:30 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0152Criminal Procedure - Successive Federal and State Prosecutions - BarIn the House - Third Reading Failed (46-89)Judiciary
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0153Office of the Public Defender - Representation at Bail Hearing - ProvisionalIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedJudiciary
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0154Criminal Procedure - District Court - Stay of Sentence Pending AppealIn the House - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0180 / CH0062
    (SB0580 / CH0061)
Medical Marijuana - Caregiver - Affirmative DefenseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 62Judiciary
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0309Courts - Discovery - Examination in Aid of Enforcement of Money JudgmentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0322
    (SB0222)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Yellow Dot ProgramIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0371Income Tax Credit - Cat and Dog AdoptionIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0408 / CH0258
    (SB0404 / CH0257)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Enhanced Agricultural Management EquipmentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 258Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0503Income Tax - Military Retirement IncomeIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0519
    (SB0112)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Eagle Harbor Artesian Well RestorationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
Co-SponsorState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0578
    (SB0023)
Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care PremiumsIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0626
    (SB0196 / CH0029)
Register of Wills - SalaryVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0667 / CH0262
    (SB0422 / CH0261)
Public School Employees - Collective Bargaining - Representation FeesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 262Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0789
    (SB0715 / CH0309)
Maryland Highway Safety Act of 2013In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0921 / CH0652
    (SB0258)
Correctional Services - Inmate Earnings - Compensation for Victims of CrimeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 652Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0952
    (SB0782)
Correctional Services - Inmate Telephone Services - Legal CounselIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB1138
    (SB0778)
Correctional Services - Inmate Welfare Fund - Telephone Financial AssistanceIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB1220 / CH0409Invalidation and Destruction of Unexecuted Warrant, Summons, or Other Criminal Process - Failure to Appear DesignationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 409Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1228Commission to Study the Disproportionate Justice Impact on MinoritiesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1232
    (SB0946)
Issuance of Search Warrant by Electronic Means Act of 2013In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1292 / CH0411Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses and AppealsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 411Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1364Courts - Breach of Contract - Attorney's FeesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1378
    (SB1017)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Bethel Recreation CenterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
Co-SponsorState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1380Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2003 - Prince George's County - Bethel Recreation CenterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrior Authorizations (B4)
HB1396 / CH0415Criminal Law - Theft-Related Crimes - PenaltiesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 415Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0228 / CH0159
    (SB0274)
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
By Request - AdministrationInsurance - Health (C3)

Denotes enacted legislation

October 30, 2013 7:50 A.M.