Delegate Kumar P. Barve

2018 Regular Session

District 17, Montgomery County

Total Bills: 13 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 13, By Request: 0)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0003
    (SB0138)
Environment - U.S. Climate Alliance - MembershipIn the House - Hearing 1/24 at 1:30 p.m.Environment and Transportation
1/24/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Co-SponsorEnvironment (M3)
HB0116Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - ProhibitionIn the House - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
1/31/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorAgriculture (M4)
HB0152Secure and Accessible Registration ActIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorElections (G1)
HB0230
    (SB0290)
Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative - Withdrawal - Legislative Approval Required (Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative Extension Act)In the House - First Reading Economic MattersEconomic MattersCo-SponsorEnvironment (M3)
HB0251Education - Family Life and Human Sexuality Curriculum - Boundaries and ConsentIn the House - First Reading Ways and MeansWays and MeansCo-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0302Income Tax Credit - Wineries and Vineyards - Sunset ExtensionIn the House - First Reading Ways and MeansWays and MeansCo-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0303Housing and Community Development - Neighborhood and Community Assistance Program Tax Credit - Maximum ContributionsIn the House - First Reading Ways and MeansWays and MeansCo-SponsorEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0306State Personnel - Rights and Protections for Nursing MothersIn the House - First Reading AppropriationsAppropriationsCo-SponsorState Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0308Maryland Estate Tax - Unified CreditIn the House - First Reading Ways and MeansWays and MeansCo-SponsorTaxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0315State Department of Education – Breakfast and Lunch Programs – Funding (Maryland Cares for Kids Act)In the House - First Reading Ways and MeansWays and MeansCo-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0325Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis QuantityIn the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0326
    (SB0288)
Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Supervised Drug Consumption Facility ProgramIn the House - First Reading Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government OperationsCo-SponsorPublic Health (J1)
HJ0002Increasing Maryland’s Competitiveness Through Gender Diversity in BoardroomsIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCo-SponsorCorporations and Associations (C1)

January 20, 2018 6:22 A.M.