Delegate Sally Jameson

2018 Regular Session

District 28, Charles County

Total Bills: 40 (Primary Sponsor: 6, Co-sponsor: 34, By Request: 0)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0004State Highways - Renaming Harry W. Nice Memorial Bridge - Harry W. Nice/Thomas "Mac" Middleton BridgeIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryTransportation - Highways (R1)
HB0047
    (SB0090)
Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems Licenses – ModificationsIn the Senate - First Reading FinanceEconomic Matters
1/24/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
FinancePrimaryBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0528
    (SB0337)
Public Utilities – Water or Sewage Disposal Systems – RatesIn the Senate - First Reading FinanceEconomic Matters
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
FinancePrimaryUtility Regulation (C5)
HB0529
    (SB0282)
Renewable Energy – Tier 2 Eligibility – ExtensionIn the House - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryUtility Regulation (C5)
HB1127
    (SB0876)
Insurance – Commercial Lines – Exemptions From FilingsIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1161
    (SB0856)
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Uninsured Division - Uninsured MotoristsIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0001 / CH0004
    (SB0002 / CH0003)
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4Judiciary
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorFamily Law (D4)
HB0018
    (SB0993)
Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution and Certificates of Cancellation - RepealIn the House - Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
1/24/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCorporations and Associations (C1)
HB0152
    (SB1048)
Secure and Accessible Registration ActIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorElections (G1)
HB0198Inheritance Tax – Perpetual Conservation Easement – Farming Purposes – ExemptionIn the House - Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0243
    (SB0968)
Task Force on Rural Internet, Broadband, Wireless, and Cellular Service - Study and ExtensionIn the House - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0301
    (SB0270)
Courts - Evidence of Sexually Assaultive Behavior - Admissibility (Repeat Sexual Predator Prevention Act of 2018)In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0308
    (SB0646)
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified CreditIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0317
    (SB0260)
State Lottery – Instant Ticket Lottery Machines – Fraternal Organizations (“Slots” for Homeless Veterans Act)In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorGaming (C7)
HB0365
    (SB0184)
Income Tax - Personal Exemptions - AlterationIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0572Income Tax – Oyster Shell Recycling Credit – Maximum Allowable Amount and Sunset RepealIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0620County Agricultural Land Preservation Programs - Recertification and Remittance of Unexpended Funds - ExtensionsIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorAgriculture (M4)
HB0656
    (SB0945)
Motor Vehicle Insurance – Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating – Use of Occupation or Education LevelIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0657
    (SB1059)
Motor Vehicle Insurance – Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating – Use of Marital Status or GenderIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0679Public Schools - School Year - Completion DateIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0732
    (SB0675)
Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorAgriculture (M4)
HB0814
    (SB0403)
Workers' Compensation - Students in Unpaid Work-Based Learning ExperiencesIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorWorkers' Compensation (K1)
HB0876
    (SB0498)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Employee-Owned BusinessesIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0961Department of Information Technology - Rural Broadband Service - Inventory and Mapping of AssetsIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1085
    (SB0749)
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Farming 4 Hunger Community Agricultural FacilityIn the House - First Reading AppropriationsAppropriationsCo-SponsorState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1086Real Property - New Residential Construction - Correction of Drainage DefectIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorReal Property (N1)
HB1209Public Safety – Silver Alert Program – Pedestrians and Case Status (Eula’s Law)In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB1231
    (SB0320)
Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport - Security Screening Checkpoint - Charitable DonationsIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTransportation - Generally (R2)
HB1298General Provisions - Commemorative Months - Maryland Sportsmanship MonthIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1483Duties of a Guardian of the Person – Petition for VisitationIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB1515Public Safety - Length of Service Award Programs - Statewide ServiceIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB1536
    (SB0546)
Higher Education - Tuition Rates - ExemptionsIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHigher Education (F2)
HB1542Department of Commerce - Employment in the State's Defense Industry - Army Alliance StudyIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1566
    (SB0854)
Public Utilities - Water and Sewage Disposal Companies - AcquisitionIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorUtility Regulation (C5)
HB1646
    (SB1036)
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - TransferIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1662No More Puppy-Mill Pups Act of 2018In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 2:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/12/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1697
    (SB1122)
Education - Commercial Gaming Revenues - Constitutional AmendmentIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCo-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HJ0001Federal Title 5 Rights for Transportation Security Administration WorkersIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 3:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/19/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTransportation - Generally (R2)
HJ0008
    (SJ0006)
Commemorating the Bicentennial of the Birth of Frederick DouglassIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 3:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/19/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - General Assembly (P5)
HJ0011
    (SJ0007)
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy AmendmentIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCo-SponsorElections (G1)

Denotes enacted legislation

February 15, 2018 5:36 P.M.